Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:24-bk-31705
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jul 16, 2024
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024

Debtor
JC Excavating Contractors, LLC
3455 County Road 1125
Farmersville, TX 75442-7507
Represented By
James M. Morrison
Lee Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Areya Holder
Areya Holder, Trustee Law Office of Areya Holder, PC PO Box 2105
Addison, TX 75001
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 06/11/2024 12:03 AM CDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
crditcrd none Mon 06/10 9:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload)([LINK 24-31705 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt number A31495214, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Mon 06/10 8:53 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by James M. Morrison of Lee Law Firm, PLLC on behalf of JC Excavating Contractors, LLC. (Morrison, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Mon 06/10 8:54 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Holder, Areya with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/16/2024 at 10:30 AM via Zoom - Holder-Aurzada: Meeting ID 615 556 2999, Passcode 1128218278, Phone 1-469-218-8997. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is future date. (Morrison, James)
Related: [-]