Texas Western District Court
Judge:Leon Schydlower
Case #: 5:23-cv-01547
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:794 Rehabilitation Act
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 3:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Comal Independent School District
Represented By
Andrew Charles Tatgenhorst
Thompson & Horton
contact info
Amber Kristine King
Thompson & Horton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J.M.
1958 Worsham Pass
San Antonio, TX 78260
Represented By
Michael P. O'Dell, I
Michael P O'Dell Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M.
Represented By
Michael P. O'Dell, I
Michael P O'Dell Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
S.M.
1958 Worsham Pass
San Antonio, TX 78260
Represented By
Michael P. O'Dell, I
Michael P O'Dell Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Mon 05/19 12:54 PM
Text Order GRANTING38 Joint Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by District Judge Leon Schydlower. The Clerk will file and keep the administrative record SEALED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (LS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
40 40 motion Summary Judgment Thu 05/15 4:06 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Comal Independent School District. (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
39 39 trial Trial Brief Thu 05/15 1:08 PM
TRIAL BRIEF Summary Judgnet Motion by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M.. (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
38 38 motion Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Wed 05/07 3:18 PM
Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Motion to Seal Admin Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order
37 37 notice Notice of Filing Wed 05/07 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Comal Independent School District (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/10 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposal for Filing Administrative Record by Comal Independent School District(Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, March 27, 2025
35 35 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 6:41 PM
ORDER re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment,22 MOTION for Summary Judgment,29 MOTION to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (LS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 12/16 10:40 AM
TRANSFER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Leon Schydlower for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 08/16 1:11 PM
Text Order DENYING20 Opposed Motion to Consolidate entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. As the Court has remanded 5:24-cv-347-XR to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, the Court DENIES Defendant's20 Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dllc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/12 5:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Comal Independent School District, re29 MOTION to Strike22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District (King, Amber)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/09 3:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Comal Independent School District, re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/09 12:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M., re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/05 10:42 AM
Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M., re29 MOTION to Strike22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
29 29 motion Strike Mon 07/29 2:26 PM
MOTION to Strike22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Evidence by Comal Independent School District. (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/29 2:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Comal Independent School District, re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M. (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/29 12:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M., re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 07/17 10:48 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M., re24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District reply to item # 25 (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
25 25 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 07/12 8:32 AM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Comal Independent School District, re20 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Comal Independent School District,23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Response filed by Plaintiff J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M. (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/08 11:14 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Comal Independent School District.(Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/08 2:18 PM
Text Order GRANTING24 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant's deadline to file a Reply in Support of its Motion to Consolidate is hereby extended to July 12, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dllc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
23 23 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 07/01 7:58 AM
Response to20 Motion to Consolidate Cases Response by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M.. (O'Dell, Michael) Modified text on 7/1/2024 (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Fri 06/28 9:41 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M.. (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Fri 06/28 8:18 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Comal Independent School District. (Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
20 20 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 06/25 1:41 PM
Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Comal Independent School District. (King, Amber)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/11 9:38 AM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2024,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 06/11 9:10 AM
Text Order GRANTING18 Unopposed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. An amended scheduling order will issue separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dllc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
18 18 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 06/10 3:51 PM
MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M.. (O'Dell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 5/1/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(wg)
Related: [-]
Text Order STRIKING1 Motion to Seal Case entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez for the reasons stated in open court. Further, the Court ORDERS that this matter be unsealed. However, Plaintiff, as a minor, will be permitted to proceed under his initials. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dllc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
15 15 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, ( Status Conference set for 5/1/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,) Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
14 14 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2024,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Text Order GRANTING11 Unopposed Motion for Exemption from Alternative Dispute Resolution entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Parties are hereby exempt from required alternative dispute resolution in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dllc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
13 13 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Comal Independent School District.(Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Advisory to the Clerk of Court,
Att: 2 Defendant's Advisory to the Clerk of Court
12 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Comal Independent School District.(Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
11 11 Unopposed MOTION to be Excused from ADR/Mediation by Comal Independent School District.(Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amber Kristine King on behalf of Comal Independent School District (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/29/2024,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 Defendant's Original ANSWER to2 Complaint by Comal Independent School District.(Tatgenhorst, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
7 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. O'Dell on behalf of J.M., J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M., S.M. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
6 6 Remark: Recd. (1) One USB Drive containing an Electronic Copy of the Certified Administrative Recording & Audio Video Exhibits 8,9,23,24 & 37. Copy forwarded to chambers of Judge Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Charles Tatgenhorst on behalf of Comal Independent School District (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M., S.M., J.M. as to Comal Independent School District. Waiver sent on 1/2/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (wg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 Case Opening Letter to J.M., S.M. (dtg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number 3956), filed by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M.(dtg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt
1 1 ****STRICKEN, PER COURT ORDER **** MOTION to Seal Case by J.M. b/n/f J.M. & S.M. (dtg) Modified on 5/2/2024 (wg).
Related: [-]
THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)
Related: [-]