Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-10167
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Antawn Davis (1)
Represented By
James J. Cipoletta
Law Offices Of James J. Cipoletta
contact info
John H. Cunha, Jr.
Cunha & Holcomb, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah Hoefle
United States Attorney'S Office Ma
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/17/2024 10:07 AM EDT
Thursday, February 08, 2024
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case as to Antawn Davis by USA. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Antawn Davis; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Antawn Davis (1) (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Antawn Davis (1).. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 2 pgs JS45
5 5 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to Antawn Davis. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Antawn Davis. CJA Attorney James Cipoletta appointed. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Antawn Davis (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs Government's Omnibus Motion to Unseal Indictments and Criminal Complaints as to Antawn Davis by USA. (Montes, Mariliz) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion to Unseal Document6 Government's Omnibus Motion to Unseal Indictments and Criminal Complaints as to Antawn Davis (1) (Montes, Mariliz) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Antawn Davis. Initial Appearance set for 2/14/2024 02:45 PM in Courtroom 20 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
9 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance as to Antawn Davis held on 2/14/2024. The court informs the def't of the charges against him and his rights. Upon review of the financial affidavit, the court will appoint CJA Cipoletta. The gov't states the maximum penalties and is not seeking detention. The defendant waives his right to a probable cause hearing. The def't is released on conditions of release. (Attorneys present: Crowley, Hoeful, Sun, Cipoletta. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Antawn Davis. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5 entered as to Antawn Davis. In compliance with the Due Process Protections Act, the Court issues the following Order. Consistent with Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, the United States is ordered to disclose all exculpatory information, in a timely manner, to the defendants. This information includes, but is not limited to, evidence that is material and is favorable to the accused. Specific categories of exculpatory evidence that must be provided to the defense are set out in Local Rule 116.2. The failure to discharge this obligation may result in consequences, including the reversal of any conviction, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the Court. [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sarah Hoefle appearing for USA. (Hoefle, Sarah) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
14 14 ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Antawn Davis. Time excluded from March 15, 2024 until May 14, 2024. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (Pacho, Arnold) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
15 15 2 pgs MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James J Cipoletta as to Antawn Davis. (Cipoletta, James) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
16 16 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Antawn Davis: Appointment of Attorney John H. Cunha Jr. (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
17 17 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney James J. Cipoletta terminated as to Antawn Davis (1) (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
18 18 2 pgs District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Antawn Davis. Time excluded from 5/14/2024 until 6/14/2024. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (24-mc-91099-AK). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 3 pgs Memorandum from Pretrial regarding noncompliance as to Antawn Davis. Requested action: Signature Required. (Skehill, Patrick) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
20 20 2 pgs MOTION to Travel as to Antawn Davis. (Cunha, John) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
21 21 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion to Travel as to Antawn Davis (1) (Russo, Noreen) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
22 22 1 pgs MOTION for Rule 11 Hearing as to Antawn Davis. (Cunha, John) [1:24-mj-01031-DLC]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
23 23 9 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) as to Antawn Davis (1) count(s) 1, 2.(Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs JS45
24 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Antawn Davis; District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
Related: [-]
25 25 District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Motion for Rule 11 Hearing as to Antawn Davis (1) (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
26 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Antawn Davis - Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information hearing set for 6/18/2024 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (In person only) before District Judge Julia E. Kobick. It is ORDERED that a copy of the written plea agreement, and/or any waiver of indictment, together with notice whether detention may follow acceptance of the plea, shall be submitted to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk (haley_currie@mad.uscourts.gov) no later than three (3) business days before the scheduled plea hearing. Counsel is to contact U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services as soon as possible [LINK:http://www.map.uscourts.gov/psi-interview-schedule] to determine scheduling of the presentence interview. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs NOTICE to Counsel - Probation Interview of Defendant as to Antawn Davis (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]