Original Case: 5:23-cv-00518

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02024
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 6:36 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
QVC INC
Represented By
Brooke Hurlbrink
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Nathan Huddell
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Edward J. Sholinsky
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STONY BATTERY RD PROPERTY OWNER LLC
Represented By
Janesa Urbano
Caplan Valenti & Murray
contact info
Jonathan Adam Ozarow
Clark Guldin
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STONY CORP BLVD LLC
Represented By
Janesa Urbano
Caplan Valenti & Murray
contact info
Jonathan Adam Ozarow
Clark Guldin
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: KRAUSE, BIBAS and MONTGOMERY-REEVES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 7. Judge: MONTGOMERY-REEVES Authoring.

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 6:36 AM EDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant QVC Inc in District Court No. 5-23-cv-00518. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order 050124
Att: 3 12 pgs District Court Memorandum 050124
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR)
Related: [-]
17 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Nathan Huddell, Esq., Brooke Hurlbrink, Esq., Edward J. Sholinsky, Esq., Jonathan Adam Ozarow, Esq., Janesa Urbano, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/25/2024. (KR)
Related: [-]