Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul W Bonapfel
Case #: 1:24-bk-56114
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fulcrum Loan Holdings, LLC
3600 Dallas Hwy SW Ste 230-148
Marietta, GA 30064-1675
Represented By
Benjamin R Keck
Keck Legal, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Saturday, May 24, 2025
176 176 misc Exhibits Sat 05/24 12:26 AM
Exhibits 1 to Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to the Pending Motions of Wayne Lyle and Charles Cary filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Related [+] (Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 175
Friday, May 23, 2025
175 175 answer Sur-Reply to Reply Fri 05/23 11:58 PM
Sur-Reply in Opposition to the Pending Motions of Wayne Lyle and Charles Cary filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Related [+](Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 46 ,60
Thursday, May 22, 2025
174 174 misc 0-Withdrawal of Document Thu 05/22 7:49 PM
Withdrawal of Document filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Related [+] (Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 158
173 173 misc 0-Certificate of Service Thu 05/22 7:29 PM
Omnibus Certificate of Service of Plans, Motions and Notices of Hearing filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Related [+] (Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 157 ,159 ,160 ,161 ,162 ,163 ,164 ,165 ,166 ,167 ,168 ,169 ,170 ,171 ,172
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
172 172 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/21 9:03 PM
Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP for Entry of an Order Approving (i) the Disclosure Statement; (ii) Procedures for the Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes to Accept or Reject the Chapter 11 Plan; (iii) Related Notice and Objection Procedures; and (iv) Related Relief, all with Respect to Debtor Fulcrum Loan Holdings, LLC Filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. with hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 (check with court for location). Related [+](Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 166 ,167
171 171 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/21 8:59 PM
Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP for Entry of an Order Approving (i) the Disclosure Statement; (ii) Procedures for the Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes to Accept or Reject the Chapter 11 Plan; (iii) Related Notice and Objection Procedures; and (iv) Related Relief, all with Respect to Debtor Strategic Retreat Holdings, LLC Filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. Related [+](Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 164 ,165
170 170 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/21 8:55 PM
Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP for Entry of an Order Approving (i) the Disclosure Statement; (ii) Procedures for the Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes to Accept or Reject the Chapter 11 Plan; (iii) Related Notice and Objection Procedures; and (iv) Related Relief, all with Respect to Debtor JARBAI, LLC Filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. with hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 (check with court for location). Related [+](Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 162 ,163
169 169 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/21 8:52 PM
Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP for Entry of an Order Approving (i) the Disclosure Statement; (ii) Procedures for the Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes to Accept or Reject the Chapter 11 Plan; (iii) Related Notice and Objection Procedures; and (iv) Related Relief, all with Respect to Debtor Fulcrum Tale, LLC Filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. Related [+](Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 160 ,161
168 168 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/21 8:40 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP for Entry of an Order Approving (i) the Disclosure Statement; (ii) Procedures for the Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes to Accept or Reject the Chapter 11 Plan; (iii) Related Notice and Objection Procedures; and (iv) Related Relief, all with Respect to Debtor HIP II, LLC Filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. Related [+](Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 157 ,159
167 167 motion Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11 Wed 05/21 7:13 PM
Disclosure Statement for Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor Fulcrum Loan Holdings, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Disclosure Statement (with Plan of Liquidation)
Att: 2 Proposed Approval Order
Att: 3 Organizational Chart
166 166 plan 01-Chapter 11 Plan - Initial Plan Wed 05/21 7:09 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor Fulcrum Loan Holdings, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Sale Procedures
Att: 2 Appendix B - Plan Administrator Retention Terms
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Listing Broker Retention Terms
Att: 4 Schedule 5.14(b)
Att: 5 Schedule Schedule 5.14(c)
Att: 6 Schedule 5.14(d)
Att: 7 Schedule 5.14(e)
Att: 8 Schedule 5.14(f)
165 165 motion Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11 Wed 05/21 7:00 PM
Disclosure Statement for Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor Strategic Retreat Holdings, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Disclosure Statement (with Plan of Liquidation)
Att: 2 Proposed Approval Order
Att: 3 Organizational Chart
164 164 plan 01-Chapter 11 Plan - Initial Plan Wed 05/21 6:55 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor Strategic Retreat Holdings, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Sale Procedures
Att: 2 Appendix B - Plan Administrator Retention Terms
Att: 3 Appendix C - Listing Broker Retention Terms
Att: 4 Schedule 5.14(b)
Att: 5 Schedule 5.14(c)
163 163 motion Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11 Wed 05/21 6:49 PM
Disclosure Statement for Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor JABARI, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Disclosure Statement (with Plan of Liquidation)
Att: 2 Proposed Approval Order
Att: 3 Organizational Chart
162 162 plan 01-Chapter 11 Plan - Initial Plan Wed 05/21 6:44 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor JARBAI, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Sale Procedures
Att: 2 Appendix B - Plan Administrator Retention Terms
Att: 3 Appendix C - Listing Broker Retention Terms
Att: 4 Schedule 5.14(b)
Att: 5 Schedule 5.14(c)
161 161 motion Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11 Wed 05/21 6:39 PM
Disclosure Statement for Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor Fulcrum Tale, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. Related [+] (Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 160
Att: 1 Disclosure Statement (with Plan of Liquidation)
Att: 2 Proposed Approval Order
Att: 3 Organizational Chart
160 160 plan 01-Chapter 11 Plan - Initial Plan Wed 05/21 6:34 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor Fulcrum Tale, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Sale Procedures
Att: 2 Appendix B - Plan Administrator Retention Terms
Att: 3 Appendix C - Listing Broker Retention Terms
Att: 4 Schedule 5.14(b)
Att: 5 Schedule Schedule 5.14(c)
159 159 motion Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11 Wed 05/21 6:19 PM
Disclosure Statement with Respect to Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor HIP II, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. Related [+] (Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 157
Att: 1 Proposed Disclosure Statement (with Plan of Liquidation)
Att: 2 Proposed Approval Order
Att: 3 Organizational Chart
158 158 motion Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11 Wed 05/21 5:34 PM
Disclosure Statement with Respect to Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP's Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor HIP II, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. Related [+] (Allerding, John)
Related: [-] 157
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Organizational Chart
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Form of Ballot
157 157 plan 01-Chapter 11 Plan - Initial Plan Wed 05/21 5:30 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation with Respect to Debtor HIP II, LLC filed by John Christopher Allerding on behalf of Bay Point Capital Partners II, LP. (Allerding, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Sale Procedures
Att: 2 Appendix B - Plan Administrator Retention Terms
Att: 3 Appendix C - Listing Broker Retention Terms
Att: 4 Schedule 5.14(b)
Att: 5 Schedule 5.14(c)