New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:24-cv-04466
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:41 AM EST
Defendant
Ilit Raz
Intervenor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
United States Attorney's Office 26 Federal Plaza
New York, NY 10278
Represented By
Peter John Davis
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
New York Regional Office 100 Pearl Street Suite 20-100
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Lindsay Senechal Moilanen
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Ariel Atlas
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Alicia Guo
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Antonia Marie Apps
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Fri 03/28 10:13 AM
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alicia Guo dated 03/28/2025 re: Status Update. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guo, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/26 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Kim Krouse on behalf of Ilit Raz..(Krouse, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Fri 11/29 1:42 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ariel Atlas dated 11/29/2024 re: Status Update. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atlas, Ariel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 11/25 3:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ilit Raz served on 10/31/2024, answer due 11/21/2024. Service was accepted by Ilit Raz. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guo, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Documents Served,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Endorsement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Delivery,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/31 2:39 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Government's motion to intervene is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that proceedings in this action are stayed in their entirety pending the conclusion of the Criminal Case, but without prejudice to any party's right to make a subsequent application to lift the stay and resume proceedings based on changed circumstances. For avoidance of doubt, the obligations to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, motion practice, document discovery, and all depositions, interrogatories, requests for admission, issuance of subpoenas, third party discovery, and any other forms of discovery, including the parties' obligation to make disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A)(i), are hereby stayed in their entirety. However, the SEC may continue attempting to serve international defendant Ilit Raz during the pendency of the stay. The parties must notify the Court within 14 days of the resolution of the criminal case. The parties must file a status letter 120 days from the date of this Order and every 120 days thereafter until the resolution of the criminal case. SO ORDERED. Case stayed. Motions terminated:9 MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/31/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Fri 07/12 9:32 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alicia Guo dated July 12, 2024 re: service of international defendant Ilit Raz. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guo, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 16 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 07/11 1:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:9 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Davis, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 motion Stay Thu 07/11 1:14 PM
MOTION to Stay . Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Davis, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/11 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter John Davis on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Davis, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 07/03 3:52 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ilit Raz..(pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/02 12:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ilit Raz, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guo, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 06/12 9:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 06/12 9:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 06/12 9:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/11 10:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Senechal Moilanen on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Moilanen, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/11 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ariel Atlas on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atlas, Ariel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 06/11 11:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guo, Alicia)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/11 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alicia Guo on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Guo, Alicia)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Ilit Raz. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Apps, Antonia)
Related: [-]