District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Dabney L Friedrich
Case #: 1:24-cv-01687
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
NEIBU ALI
Represented By
Anthony George Bizien
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Philip B. Zipin
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Defendant
FOCUS LLC
Represented By
Anthony George Bizien
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Philip B. Zipin
Zipin, Amster & Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIEN HARRIS
Represented By
Stephen B. Lebau
Lebau & Neuworth, LLC
contact info
Nicholas Conlon
Brown, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/13 5:42 PM
ORDER denying the defendants'16 Partial Motion to Dismiss. See text for details. The defendants shall answer the14 Amended Complaint on or before May 27, 2025. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 13, 2025 (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 02/25 5:59 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FOCUS LLC, NEIBU ALI. Attorney Anthony George Bizien terminated. (Zipin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/03 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Form by JULIEN HARRIS(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Consent to Join Form
Thursday, November 07, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 11/07 10:58 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re16 Motion to Dismiss filed by FOCUS LLC, NEIBU ALI. (Bizien, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/05 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Forms by JULIEN HARRIS(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Consent to Join Forms
Thursday, October 31, 2024
18 18 11 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 10/31 5:09 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re16 Motion to Dismiss filed by JULIEN HARRIS.(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/23 3:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 Partial MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by JULIEN HARRIS.(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/23 3:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendant's16 Partial Motion to Dismiss on or before October 31, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 23, 2024 (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Thu 10/10 11:45 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by NEIBU ALI, FOCUS LLC.(Bizien, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/23 9:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's14 Amended Complaint, the defendants'11 Partial Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the defendants shall file a response to the plaintiff's amended complaint, or seek an extension of time to do so, on or before October 10, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 23, 2024. (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
15 15 5 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 09/19 7:51 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re11 Motion to Dismiss filed by JULIEN HARRIS.(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/19 7:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint against NEIBU ALI, FOCUS LLC with Jury Demand filed by JULIEN HARRIS.(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 3 pgs motion Stay Mon 09/09 11:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline to Move for Class Certification Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1) and LCvR 23.1(b) by JULIEN HARRIS.(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/09 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Conlon on behalf of JULIEN HARRIS (Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 09/09 6:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff's13 Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline to Move for Class Certification is GRANTED and the deadline is extended until the court rules on the defendants' pending11 partial motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 9, 2024. (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Thu 09/05 8:44 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss by NEIBU ALI, FOCUS LLC.(Bizien, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/30 6:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants'10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 5, 2024. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 30, 2024. (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 07/29 8:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by NEIBU ALI, FOCUS LLC.(Bizien, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/29 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip B. Zipin on behalf of All Defendants (Zipin, Philip)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/29 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony George Bizien on behalf of All Defendants (Bizien, Anthony)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error Mon 07/29 7:51 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edmund Celiesius, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.. The following error(s) need correction: Other- Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a payment of $100 (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please submit payment using event: Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion. (mg) (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 07/29 2:24 PM
Payment for7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edmund Celiesius, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.,6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- nicholas conlon, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.. ($100; Receipt number ADCDC-11056835). (Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 2:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edmund Celiesius, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JULIEN HARRIS.(Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration E. C.,
Att: 2 Declaration good standing certificate EC,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order order E.C.
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 1:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- nicholas conlon, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JULIEN HARRIS.(Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration conlon,
Att: 2 Declaration certificate good standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order conlon order
5 5 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 07/26 12:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NEIBU ALI served on 7/11/2024, answer due 8/1/2024 (Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 07/26 12:06 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOCUS LLC served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024 (Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 2:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 26, 2024. (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error Fri 07/26 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edmund Celiesius, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.,6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- nicholas conlon, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.. The following error(s) need correction: Other- Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a payment of $100 (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please submit payment using event: Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 07/26 5:42 PM
Payment for7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edmund Celiesius, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.,6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- nicholas conlon, Fee Status: No Fee Paid.. ($100; Receipt number ADCDC-11054344). (Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
3 3 order .Order Thu 06/20 1:14 PM
STANDARD ORDER. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 20, 2024. (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/14 12:43 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 11:04 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to NEIBU ALI, FOCUS LLC.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
Att: 2 Exhibit consent to sue,
Att: 3 Summons ali,
Att: 4 Summons focus
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by julien harris.(Lebau, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit consent to sue,
Att: 3 Summons ali,
Att: 4 Summons focus