Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-20401

Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:James J Tancredi
Case #: 2:24-ap-02009
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Boguslawa Elzbieta Dziura
271 Jackson Street
Willimantic, CT 06226
Represented By
Boguslawa Elzbieta Dziura
contact info
Plaintiff
Roberta Napolitano
Roberta Napolitano c/o Roberta Napolitano Chapter 13 Trustee 10 Columbus Boulevard 06106-5112, Ste 6th Floor
Hartford, CT 06106
Represented By
Roberta Napolitano
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/05 12:19 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:24-ap-2009 Closed. . (ts)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/29 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Monday, August 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/26 8:06 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . (kpb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 court Hearing Held Fri 08/23 2:17 PM
Pretrial Conference held. Order Granting to Dismiss to enter Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Roberta Napolitano). (rs)
Related: [-]
5 5 audio Digital Audio Recording Thu 08/22 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/22/2024 11:23:58 AM ]. File Size [ 663 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:50 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
4 4 audio Digital Audio Recording Thu 08/15 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/15/2024 11:33:00 AM ]. File Size [ 358 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:00 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Continued Pretrial Conference Thu 08/15 6:30 PM
Pretrial Conference held and continued pursuant to reasons stated on the record.. No appearance at pretrial conference held on 8/15/2024. Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Roberta Napolitano, 2 Summons Issued). Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 11:00 AM United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT for2 and for1 , (lbw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 06/11 12:43 PM
Summons Issued on Defendant(s) Boguslawa Elzbieta Dziura Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Roberta Napolitano). Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/15/2024 at 11:00 AM. (lbw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 4:32 PM
Adversary case 24-02009 Complaint (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Roberta Napolitano against Boguslawa Elzbieta Dziura. Receipt #Deferred Fee Amount $350. Fee Deferred. (Napolitano, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet