Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-16237

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:24-ap-01460
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Angela Rizzo
75 Todd Road
Boonton, NJ 07005
Represented By
Angela Rizzo
contact info
Defendant
Somerset Savings Bank, SLA
220 West Union Avenue P.O. Box 2121
Bound Brook, NJ 08805
Represented By
Somerset Savings Bank, SLA
contact info
Plaintiff
John Sywilok
John W. Sywilok, Chapter 7 Trustee 52 Main Street
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
John Sywilok
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 03/07 2:44 PM
Adversary Case (2:24-ap-1460) Closed. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 02/23 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
21 21 order Default Judgment Thu 02/20 3:42 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 7055. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/20/2025. (ntp)
Related: [-] 18 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok
20 20 misc Support Thu 02/20 11:31 AM
Memorandum of Law in support of Related [+] filed by John Sywilok on behalf of John Sywilok. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-] 18 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok
19 19 misc Support Thu 02/20 11:28 AM
Military Status in support of Related [+] filed by John Sywilok on behalf of John Sywilok. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-] 18 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok
Att: 1 Exhibit Military Status Report
court Hearing Held Thu 02/20 3:45 PM
Minute of Hearing Scheduled, OUTCOME: Order to Show Cause Satisfied Related [+] (ntp)
Related: [-] 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/24/2025. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
court Hearing Held Tue 02/18 11:50 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Matter To Be Decided on the Papers Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/24/2025. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 02/19 9:12 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/18/2025 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2025 at 10:00 AM , SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-] 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/24/2025. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.
Friday, February 14, 2025
18 18 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Fri 02/14 1:22 PM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Angela Rizzo aka Angela Bernhard filed by John Sywilok on behalf of John Sywilok. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Sunday, January 26, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 01/27 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 court BNC Hrg to Dismiss Case Mon 01/27 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Hearing to Dismiss Case. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
15 15 order Show Cause (Upload) Fri 01/24 11:31 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/24/2025. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/21 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 court Entry of Default Wed 12/18 9:51 AM
Entry of Default against Angela Rizzo Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. (ntp)
Related: [-] 11 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 4:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by John Sywilok on behalf of John Sywilok. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-] Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:11 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok). Type of Error: No certificate of service Attached, filed by John Sywilok. Please correct and file a certificate of service with the court. (ntp)
Monday, November 25, 2024
court Notice of Docketing Error Mon 11/25 3:57 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: No certificate of service Attached, filed by John Sywilok. Please correct and file a certificate of service with the court. (ntp)
Related: [-] 11 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 misc Request to Enter Default Fri 11/22 11:48 AM
Request to Enter Default Against Angela Rizzo aka Angela Bernhard filed by John Sywilok on behalf of John Sywilok. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Entry of Default
Sunday, October 27, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 10/28 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
9 9 order File Default Papers Fri 10/25 4:13 PM
Order to File Default Papers. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/25/2024. Deadline to file default papers is 11/25/2024. (ntp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
court Hearing Held Wed 09/04 4:18 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Request to Enter Default to be Filed Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to John Sywilok for Service on Angela Rizzo Answer due on 7/11/2024; Somerset Savings Bank, SLA Answer due on 7/11/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/13/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 08/16 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
7 7 order Consent Order Tue 08/13 1:55 PM
CONSENT ORDER SETTLING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING BETWEEN THE TRUSTEE AND SOMERSET REGAL BANK Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/13/2024. (ntp)
Related: [-] 5 Certification Concerning Proposed Order filed by Defendant Somerset Savings Bank, SLA
utility Terminate Party Tue 08/13 1:57 PM
Defendant Somerset Savings Bank, SLA terminated, Reason: Consent Order Settling Adversary Proceeding Signed and Entered (ntp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 08/12 4:14 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 09/04/2024 at 11:30 a.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Sywilok,3 Summons Issued
5 5 misc Certification Concerning Proposed Order Mon 08/12 1:10 PM
Certification Concerning Proposed Order Related [+]. Filed by Michael Kahme on behalf of Somerset Savings Bank, SLA. (Kahme, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to John Sywilok for Service on Angela Rizzo Answer due on 7/11/2024; Somerset Savings Bank, SLA Answer due on 7/11/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/13/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dlr)
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 08/12 4:14 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 08/13/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to John Sywilok for Service on Angela Rizzo Answer due on 7/11/2024; Somerset Savings Bank, SLA Answer due on 7/11/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/13/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/10 10:06 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Michael Kahme on behalf of Somerset Savings Bank, SLA. (Kahme, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 06/12 1:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01460 SLM] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number ESTACC, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (dmc)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 06/11 4:12 PM
Summons Issued to John Sywilok for Service on Angela Rizzo Answer due on 7/11/2024; Somerset Savings Bank, SLA Answer due on 7/11/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 8/13/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
2 2 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Tue 06/11 11:03 AM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by John Sywilok on behalf of John Sywilok. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 10:31 AM
Adversary case 24-01460 Complaint by John Sywilok against Angela Rizzo ; Somerset Savings Bank, SLA. Fee Amount $ 350.. (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Pre Trial Instructions