Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:24-cv-01384
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2024-012689
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 2:12 AM MST
Defendant
JB Hunt Transport Incorporated
Represented By
Ryan Shawn Patterson
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
William Lee Thorpe
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
Defendant
Eduardo Serrato
Represented By
Thomas Clarke Hall
Hill Hall & Deciancio PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edelmira Encarnacion
Represented By
Richard Lloyd Adams
Morgan & Morgan - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steve J Jones
Morgan & Morgan - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Hanifon
Represented By
Richard Lloyd Adams
Morgan & Morgan - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steve J Jones
Morgan & Morgan - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Unknown Serrato
Terminated: 09/18/2024
Represented By
Thomas Clarke Hall
Hill Hall & Deciancio PLC
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Terminated: 09/18/2024


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, May 19, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 05/19 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/14 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney) Thu 04/24 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by Thomas Clarke Hall. (Hall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 04/22 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 04/18 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 04/18 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Eduardo Serrato. (Hall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/07 11:54 AM
NOTICE re: of Service of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon . (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/07 11:53 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time Reconsideration & Extending Deadlines and/or Permit Late Disclosure by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon.(Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 04/03 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 2:27 PM
NOTICE re: of Service of IMEs to Plaintiffs by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated . (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 03/13 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 03/05 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 03/03 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Eduardo Serrato. (Hall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 02/25 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Tue 02/25 2:13 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T Liburdi: Status Conference held on 2/25/2025. Case status and the parties' Stipulation to Extend Deadlines24 are discussed. For the reasons stated on the record, the parties' Stipulation to Extend Deadlines24 is denied. The deadlines in the Scheduling Order14 are affirmed. APPEARANCES: Richard Adams for Plaintiffs. Ryan Patterson and Thomas Hall for Defendants. (Court Reporter Cathy Taylor.) Hearing held 10:32 AM to 10:48 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 02/20 9:46 AM
ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/25/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/19/2025. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation Fri 02/14 3:40 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon.(Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 02/03 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 01/24 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/23 1:40 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Parties At Fault by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated . (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 12/12 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/03 9:15 AM
NOTICE re: Appearance by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon . (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Mon 09/30 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Clarke Hall on behalf of Eduardo Serrato, Unknown Serrato. (Hall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 09/30 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Eduardo Serrato, Unknown Serrato. (Hall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 09/30 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 09/30 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/19 8:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/18/2025. Dispositive motions due by 8/15/2025. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/18/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Wed 09/18 12:42 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T Liburdi: Scheduling Conference held on 9/18/2024. Discussion is held. Attorney Ellen Stark is advised that she must file a notice of appearance. Case status and scheduling are discussed. Separate Scheduling Order to issue. IT IS ORDERED dismissing Unknown Serrato and Unknown Parties. APPEARANCES: Richard Adams for Plaintiff. Ryan Patterson and Ellen Stark for Defendants. (Court Reporter Cathy Taylor.) Hearing held 10:03 AM to 10:39 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Tue 09/17 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steve J Jones on behalf of Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon. (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Wed 08/28 3:02 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon.(Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/30 10:52 AM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Rule 16 Scheduling Order by Edelmira Encarnacion . (Jones, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 07/29 12:49 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for September 18, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 504. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 21 days before the Scheduling Conference. At this meeting, the parties shall develop a Joint Proposed Case Management Report. The parties must jointly file the Joint Proposed Case Management Report with the Clerk of the Court at least 10 days before the Scheduling Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 10 days, Plaintiff(s) must serve this Order on any Defendant(s) that has not yet appeared or answered. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 7/29/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 12:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated.(Patterson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 10:34 AM
Defendants Serrato's ANSWER to Complaint by Eduardo Serrato.(Hall, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 06/24 9:55 AM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc.5 ). Defendants shall file their answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before 7/26/2024. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 6/21/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Fri 06/21 11:02 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT for Defendants to File Their Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated.(Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Their Answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint
Thursday, June 20, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 3:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Tue 06/11 10:47 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
2 2 misc New Case Opened Tue 06/11 10:46 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23135636. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01384 PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 06/11 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-012689. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23135636 filed by JB Hunt Transport Incorporated. (submitted by William Thorpe)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
***State Court record received on 6/10/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon JB Hunt Transport Incorporated on 5/23/2024.***Certificate of Service filed in State Court on 5/20/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/10/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
***State Court Record received on 6/10/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Eduardo Serrato on 6/02/2024.***Proof of Service filed in State Court on 6/05/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/10/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Tue 06/11 10:40 AM
***State Court record received on 6/10/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon JB Hunt Transport Incorporated on 5/23/2024.***Certificate of Service filed in State Court on 5/20/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/10/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK)
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Tue 06/11 10:44 AM
***State Court Record received on 6/10/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Edelmira Encarnacion, Robert Hanifon: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Eduardo Serrato on 6/02/2024.***Proof of Service filed in State Court on 6/05/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/10/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK)
Related: [-]