Richardson v. Wangerin et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Toby Crouse |
Referred: | Angel D Mitchell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04051 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:03 AM CST |
Defendant
Shawn Wangerin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
48 | 48
![]() NOTICE of Business Records Subpoenas by Shawn Wangerin (Moe, Crystal) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/06 3:57 PM
By May 29, 2025 , the parties must resubmit a proposed scheduling order to chambers. The court will reconvene the scheduling conference at 3:00 p.m. on June 5, 2025 by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 913-423-10101 ACCESS CODE 172480243 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/6/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
46 | 46
![]() REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Ryan Young re:40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
45 | 45
![]() RESPONSE by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson re40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/12 2:25 PM
ORDER granting43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support . Response deadline 2/25/2025. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 2/12/25. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) |
|
43 | 43
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion to Stay Discovery
Wed 01/29 12:11 PM
ORDER granting41 Defendant Young's Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Notice of Cancelled Hearing. The court grants the motion because40 Defendant Young's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings raises qualified immunity issues and also because the motion is unopposed. Discovery in this matter is stayed as to all parties pending the court's ruling on Defendant Young's motion for judgment on the pleadings (ECF 40). In light of the stay, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/6/2025 at 11:30 AM is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/29/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh) |
|
41 | 41
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
40 | 40
![]() MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 01/22 10:03 AM
ORDER denying motion for additional pages, Doc.38 . Defendant seeks additional pages to argue in support of dismissing an amended complaint. That request is denied because there has been no showing that Defendant cannot adequately present a defense within established page limitations. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 1/22/25. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Tue 01/21 3:58 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 38 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh) |
||
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
37 | 37
![]() ORDER. The undersigned will conduct a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 scheduling conference on February 6, 2025, at 11:30 a.m. The scheduling conference will be held by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 913-423-1010 ACCESS CODE 172 480 243 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. By January 30, 2025, the parties must submit a proposed scheduling order to the undersigned's chambers with an overall discovery completion deadline of June 27, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/16/2025. (sz) |
|
36 | 36
![]() ANSWER to33 Amended Complaint by Ryan Young.(Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ANSWER to33 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Designation of Place of Trial by Shawn Wangerin.(Moe, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 01/14 8:43 AM
ORDER denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Doc.19 , as moot. Plaintiff recently received permission to file an amended complaint, Doc. 32, and, in turn, filed that amended complaint, Doc. 33. As a result, Defendant's previously filed motion, Doc. 19, is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 1/14/25. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to Court Order of 30-Dec-2024 against All Defendants, filed by Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson.(Shuart, Blake) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Richardson's Motion to Amend Complaint20 is granted. Richardson is directed to file the Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry within three business days. Ryan Young's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply31 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on December 30, 2024. (mls) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() MOTION for Leave to file a Sur-reply by Defendant Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Stay Discovery
Fri 11/08 11:31 AM
ORDER granting24 Defendant Ryan Young's Motion to Stay Discovery and Notice of Cancelled Hearing. The parties have advised the court that they have conferred and no party opposes the motion to stay discovery, so the court grants the motion as unopposed. Discovery in this matter is stayed as to all parties pending the court's ruling on Defendant Young's motion for judgment on the pleadings (ECF 19). In light of the stay, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/8/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson re:20 Motion to Amend Complaint, (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() RESPONSE by Defendant Shawn Wangerin re20 Motion to Amend Complaint,(Branson, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines
Tue 10/29 3:03 PM
ORDER granting25 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Deadlines on Defendant Ryan Young's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings pending disposition of plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 10/29/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) |
|
26 | 26
![]() RESPONSE by Defendant Ryan Young re20 Motion to Amend Complaint,(Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Mon 10/28 12:46 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 25 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines re 20 MOTION to Amend Complaint re 1 Complaint (attorney), , 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 24 MOTION to Stay Discovery . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh) |
||
Friday, October 25, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines re20 MOTION to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint (attorney), ,19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ,24 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John Ralston on behalf of Ryan Young (Ralston, John) |
|
22 | 22
![]() PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for all Deadlines. By November 8, 2024, the parties must resubmit a proposed scheduling order to chambers with an overall discovery completion deadline of March 28, 2025. The court will reconvene the scheduling conference at 10:00 a.m. on November 21, 2024 by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell, unless the court determines the scheduling conference is unnecessary given the court's ruling on Young's anticipated motion to stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/17/2024. (ca) |
|
21 | 21
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 10/17 11:23 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 10/17/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 09, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Ryan Young(Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 07, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shawn Wangerin of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Moe, Crystal) |
|
17 | 17
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson. (Shuart, Blake) |
|
16 | 16
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) by Ryan Young. (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2024 at 11:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/27/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/7/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 08/22/2024. (kmc) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand and Designation of Place of Trial by Shawn Wangerin.(Branson, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan Young.(Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/25 10:26 AM
ORDER granting11 Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Ryan Young and Shawn Wangerin must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 12, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/25/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/29/2024 for Defendant Shawn Wangerin to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/15/2024. (ca) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Crystal B. Moe on behalf of Shawn Wangerin. (Moe, Crystal) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Charles Edward Branson on behalf of Shawn Wangerin. (Branson, Charles) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson upon Ryan Young served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/29/2024 (Shuart, Blake) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson upon Shawn Wangerin served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/15/2024 (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/29/2024 for Defendant Ryan Young to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/26/2024. (nac) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Martens on behalf of Ryan Young (Martens, Nathaniel) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson - trial to be held in Topeka. (Shuart, Blake) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson. (Shuart, Blake) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 06/12 8:22 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/12 2:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shawn Wangerin, Ryan Young. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac) |
||
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6376400.), filed by Tisha Michelle Conard Richardson. (Shuart, Blake) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |