Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20792

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-02156
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
William Scott Shroyer
1116 Edgewood Drive
Redding, CA 96003
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Jamie P. Dreher
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/12 9:33 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:24-ap-2156 Closed (msts)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
32 32 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Wed 10/30 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
31 31 notice BNC Service of Document Mon 10/28 10:42 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (isaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
30 30 order Default Judgment (Sua sponte) Mon 10/28 10:42 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant William Scott Shroyer (isaf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
29 29 misc Matter Held * Thu 10/24 4:54 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint 24-02156 by K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. against William Scott Shroyer. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7362720) (msam) (auto)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Matter Held * Thu 10/24 4:04 PM
Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Judgment for plaintiff Re:22 - Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DB-1] (auto)
Related: [-]
27 27 audio Audio Docket Entry Wed 10/23 2:40 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 10/23/2024 1:44:18 PM ]. File Size [ 4027 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:11 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
utility Add Party via Internet Site Fri 10/11 10:59 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
26 26 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 09/16 11:08 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of22 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DB-1],23 Notice of Hearing,24 Declaration,25 Request for Judicial Notice (mpem)
Related: [-]
25 25 related Request for Judicial Notice Mon 09/16 11:07 AM
Request for Judicial Notice Re:22 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DB-1] Filed by Plaintiff K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. (mpem)
Related: [-]
24 24 related Declaration Mon 09/16 11:06 AM
Declaration of Eric Stewart in support of22 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DB-1] (mpem)
Related: [-]
23 23 related Notice of Hearing Mon 09/16 11:05 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:22 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DB-1] to be held on 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (mpem)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Default Judgment - Including Amended Motion Mon 09/16 11:05 AM
Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DB-1] Filed by Plaintiff K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. (mpem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
21 21 utility Notice of Entry (Certificate) Wed 08/28 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of19 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Entry (BNC) (Do Not Use for L70) Mon 08/26 11:43 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re:18 Order Discharging11 Order to Show Cause (mpem) (mpem)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
20 20 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 08/26 11:46 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 10/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (mpem)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Mon 08/26 11:42 AM
Order Discharging11 Order to Show Cause (mpem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 misc Matter Continued * Fri 08/23 2:34 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint 24-02156 by K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. against William Scott Shroyer. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7362720) (msam) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 10/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Matter Held * Fri 08/23 2:12 PM
Civil Minutes -- Order to show cause Discharged Re:11 - Order to Show Cause ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/21/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltrf) (auto)
Related: [-]
15 15 audio Audio Docket Entry Wed 08/21 3:54 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 8/21/2024 1:48:59 PM ]. File Size [ 2725 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:34 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
14 14 answer Response/Reply Thu 08/15 11:12 AM
Response/Reply Filed by Defendant William Scott Shroyer Re:11 Order to Show Cause (mpem)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2024
12 12 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 08/11 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
11 11 order Show Cause Fri 08/09 4:08 PM
Order to Show Cause ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/21/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltrf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
10 10 audio Audio Docket Entry Thu 08/08 3:28 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 8/7/2024 2:06:54 PM ]. File Size [ 1285 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:34 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
13 13 misc Matter Continued * Wed 08/14 10:28 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint 24-02156 by K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. against William Scott Shroyer. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7362720) (msam) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 8/21/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 08/01 9:49 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Discovery Plan (mpem)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Discovery Plan Thu 08/01 9:48 AM
Discovery Plan Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. (mpem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Tue 06/11 10:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet,4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer,6 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (wmim)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate PARTY - Including Supplemental Mon 06/10 3:18 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party Filed by Plaintiff K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. (msam)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 06/10 3:16 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (msam)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 06/10 3:15 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (msam)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 06/10 3:14 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 8/7/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (msam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 06/10 3:12 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 06/10 3:12 PM
(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint 24-02156 by K&S Staffing Solutions, Inc. against William Scott Shroyer. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7362720) (msam)
Related: [-]