Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:M Hannah Lauck
Case #: 3:24-cv-00429
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 5:28 AM EST
Defendant
Topside Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Kevin D. Holden
Jackson Lewis Pc (va)
contact info
Timothy J. Gorde, Jr
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Alonzo Morton
Represented By
Scott Gregory Crowley
Crowley & Crowley
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case So Ordered Fri 03/14 9:57 AM
So Ordered JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/14/2025. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/12 1:54 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Alonzo Morton. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Crowley, Scott). Modified on 3/12/2025. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 03/04 8:41 AM
Deferred Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 at 02:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck CANCELLED. Case has settled. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Mon 03/03 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Topside Federal Credit Union (Gorde, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 02/04 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/4/2025. (Court Reporter Ruth Levy, OCR) (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/04 11:21 AM
Set Hearing: Deferred Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 at 02:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 01/23 9:21 AM
Set Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 01/16 10:12 AM
***Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 2:30 PM CANCELLED. To be rescheduled. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 misc Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/03 11:36 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Alonzo Morton. (Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (other) Mon 12/30 4:35 PM
NOTICE by Topside Federal Credit Union of Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Gorde, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 12:50 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. Counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than January 2, 2025, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 12/13/2024. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 12:48 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 12/13/2024. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/13 12:50 PM
Set Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 02:30 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 10/29 9:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight: Settlement Conference held on 10/25/2024. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/13 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Gorde, Jr on behalf of Topside Federal Credit Union (Gorde, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order Wed 08/21 12:22 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on October 25, 2024, at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. In addition to counsel, each party must have a representative physically present with the full authority to settle this action. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 8/21/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 08/21 1:03 PM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/25/2024 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 3:19 PM
ORDER that the Court ORDERS the Parties to participate in a settlement conference. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight for the purpose of settlement conference and proceedings. Counsel SHALL contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Speight within 5 days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference, which should occur at such time as Magistrate Judge Speight shall approve. Counsel SHALL abide by whatever further instructions or requirements may be imposed by Magistrate Judge Speight. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/30/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/31 8:37 AM
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 07/26 5:27 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Topside Federal Credit Union. (Holden, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Topside Federal Credit Union.(Holden, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 10:44 AM
LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7(E) STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/16/2024. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/27 4:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alonzo Morton. (Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
misc Notice of Correction Wed 06/12 8:30 AM
Notice of Correction: Filing attorney reminded to file proposed summonses or waiver of service. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 4:19 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9576804.), filed by Alonzo Morton.(Crowley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 06/11 4:40 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]