South et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03392 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00597 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:40 AM EST |
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Flaherty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Schaefer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert South
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David L Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Starks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald F Gilchrist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Gibbons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome E Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian David Frassato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Bilancione
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Paul Dowell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward W Allsman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Aaron Vigil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Draper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Cowie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Euel Winsor King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gale Scott Kerkeski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Reid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason P Ramey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Graybill III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Treina Michelle Payton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Grosvenor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Chapman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hanson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leon Hinkle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman David Moore Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Hopson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Jean Mccune
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hurlbut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Liner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER This Order Relates to 2:24-cv-03027; 2:24-cv-03026; 2:24-cv-03025; 2:24-cv-03024; 2:24-cv-02971; 2:24-cv-03392; 2:24-cv-03127; 2:24-cv-03194. The Defendants' motion to dismiss the claims of the Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 6472-1) for failure to serve executed and completed Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets (Dkt. No. 6472 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (18) in case 2:24-cv-03024-RMG; (18) in case 2:24-cv-03025-RMG; (20) in case 2:24-cv-03026-RMG; (16) in case 2:24-cv-03027-RMG; (12) in case 2:24-cv-03194-RMG; (4) in case 2:24-cv-02971-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-03127-RMG; (10) in case 2:24-cv-03392-RMG) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed in Plaintiffs Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 6523-1) and in footnote 2 to Defendants' reply (Dkt. No. 6580 at 1) remain. The claims of the remaining Plaintiffs listed in Defendants Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 6421-1) are dismissed without prejudice, subject to reinstatement upon the service of executed and completed PFS pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5, paragraphs 22 through 26. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/27/2025.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re (18 in 2:24-cv-03025-RMG, 10 in 2:24-cv-03392-RMG, 6472 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 18 in 2:24-cv-03024-RMG, 8 in 2:24-cv-03127-RMG, 12 in 2:24-cv-03194-RMG, 20 in 2:24-cv-03026-RMG, 16 in 2:24-cv-03027-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-02971-RMG) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets , Scott Anderchin, BJ Barnes, Nathan Barnwell, Kristen Margaret Baucas, Jeffrey Beal, Drexel Biddle, Keith Buford, Sr., Eugene Charles, Stanley Crayton, William Cruz, Response filed by Douglas Anthony Ross, Martin Ruffin, Rashad Sallee, Melvin Sanders, Tammy L Schieber, James Schwecke, Gary Ray Sessions, Cindy Marie Sheppard, Robert Skiber, James Skinner, Carl Dennis Smith, Conrad Stoutamire, William Lloyd Stern Jr, James Matthew Stillwell, Michael D Reed Sr, Cary Joe Suitt, Keith Taylor, Brian Thomas, Donte Maurice Thomas, Timothy Alan Topor, Henry Ray Torrez, Robert Reynolds, Steve Turpin, Joe Villanueva, Etta C Washington, Jonathan Watkins, Nicholas Rhodes, Sean Westerlund, Daniel W Wilborn III, Aaron Richardson, Marshall Woods, Shawn Wootten, Hugh Wright, Mark Scott Rieman, Tarvara Robertson, Demario Robinson, Jose Rodriguez, William Kelly, Russell W Livingston Sr, William Lockner, Alan Machiela, Lawrence Kempert, Michael Martin, Jessica Mcclellan, Patrick Mcclellan, Ronald Lamar Mccrary, Mark Mcdonald, James McGregor, David Grant Michael, Sherlock Miller, Vahl Mills, Michael Allen Milner, Gregory Mims, Timothy Lee Moose, Donald Morley, Wunnie Murray Jr, Richard Nance, Jeffrey Nelson, Jerald Norvell, George O'gar, Robert W Oliver, Daniel O'neill, Bruce Owens, Sheree Owens, James J Klegman, Roy Elliot Pearl, Earl Michael Patrick Knox, Isaac Poling, Fard Potts, Kendra D Powell, Dennis E Pringle, George P Keary, Jeff La Viola, Mark Allen Lain, Janson Lasalle, Wendy Lattimer, Jackie L. Fears, Danny Allen Ferguson, Christopher Fernandez, Robert Ferriera, Brian Fraser, Carlton Freeman, Fred Frey, Gregory Dale Frykman, Matthew T. Dillon, Matthew Gargagliano, Keith Gerlach, Maurice Diluzio, Ronald Graham, Wayne Michael Granit, James P. Halpin, Sr, Byron Hardman, Nicholas Wendel Harper, Langston Harrell, Gregory Harte, Charles Hartley, Quinton Heard, Eric Henley, Christopher Hernandez, Bobbi Hood, Kenyatta Hunter, Antwan James, Donald James, Donald C. Jasch, Lareta Jenkins, Milton Ray Jennings, Calvin Bernard Johnson, Keith Jones, Tierney Jones, Eddie Wesley Edwards, Robert E Elmore, Timothy Bauer, Matthew Beard, Mark Beebe, David Allen, Michel Berenson, James Richard Allen, Albert Bowmaster, Richard Bradley, Bobby Brown, Edward Brown, Trevor Clayton Bruce, Curtis Bryan, James T Bryson, Jr, Terrence Burgess, Johnna Butler, Richard Callihan, Robert Campbell, Tracey Casselman, Raymond C Balcer, Jr, Acie Catron, Mark Chaussee, Crockett Anderson, James Clark, Mioshi Collins, Paul Conway, John Anderson, James Joseph Cordova, Frank Corso, Keith Anderson, Robert Ayala, Blaine Baker, Jaran Ball, Bradley J Banks, Jody Yerg, Tammie Newsome, Dennis Starks, Matthew Walker, Christopher Bilancione, David Draper, Michael Flaherty, Benjamin Grosvenor, Gale Scott Kerkeski, Jason P Ramey.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/3/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brian Thomas, Jonathan Watkins, Aaron Richardson, Marshall Woods, Jose Rodriguez, Lawrence Kempert, Jerald Norvell, Kendra D Powell, Wendy Lattimer, Maurice Diluzio, Byron Hardman, Eric Henley, Christopher Hernandez, Richard Bradley, Acie Catron, John Anderson, Jaran Ball Nathan Barnwell, and David Spottsyl Draper without prejudiceAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jackie L. Fears, Danny Allen Ferguson, Christopher Fernandez, Robert Ferriera, Brian Fraser, Gregory Dale Frykman, Matthew Gargagliano, Ronald Graham, Wayne Michael Granit, Langston Harrell, Gregory Harte, Bobbi Hood, Antwan James, Donald James, Lareta Jenkins, Calvin Bernard Johnson, Keith Jones, Tierney Jones, Robert E Elmore, Matthew Beard, Mark Beebe, Bobby Brown, Edward Brown, Trevor Clayton Bruce, Curtis Bryan, Terrence Burgess, Johnna Butler, Raymond C Balcer, Jr, Mioshi Collins, Paul Conway, James Joseph Cordova, Keith Anderson, Eddie Cruz, Robert Ayala, Bradley J Banks, Michael Flaherty, Benjamin Grosvenor, Jason P Ramey Jeffrey A Beal as to Michauskas, et al; Drexel Wayne Biddle, Jr. as to Michauskas, et al; Keith S. Buford, Sr. as to Michauskas, et al; Eugene Charles as to Michauskas, et al; Stanley Crayton as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PEJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03026-RMG, 2:24-cv-03027-RMG, 2:24-cv-03194-RMG, 2:24-cv-03392-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets by W.L. Gore & Associates. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cheffo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bobby Joe Lambert, Gregory John Crispo, LAWRENCE ELLIS, Roshonda Bailey, Jay Smith, Robert Underwood, Kenneth Whaley, Eric Anthony Jordan, Steven Troy Fisher, Michael Zepeda, Charles C Marshall, Robert Parker, Johnarfin Goodjoint, Van Bass, David Ammons, Norman B Chapman, Randall Bonds, Keith Michael Burkhalter, Sheri Carlson, Micheal Francis, John Hanson, Patrick F Roberts, Ronald Hansen, Mark Bryant, Shaun Deprez, Nicholas James Lewis, James Norman, Bilal A Malik, David Rivera, Timothy H Sinex, James Edward Taylor John Leston as to Jones, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 06/11 10:01 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 6/7/2024), 2:24-cv-00597, South et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03392-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00597. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting3 Defendant 3M Companys Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant 3M Company is ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before 28 days after the JPML renders its final decision concerning transfer of this action to the In re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2873. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/22/2024. (CMD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/11/2024.] | |
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4590181. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2024-901284., filed by 3M Company.(KNS). (Radney, W) Modified on 5/14/2024 ALND Rec# B-11527 (KNS). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/11/2024.] |