Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Kevin Day Dunlow (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Erin C. Blondel
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Gabriel J Diaz
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/12/2024 3:59 AM EDT
Friday, May 24, 2024
5 5 MOTION to Unseal filed by USA as to Kevin Day Dunlow. (Pendergrass, C) [5:24-mj-01651-BM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal as to Kevin Day Dunlow (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 5/24/2024. (Pendergrass, C) [5:24-mj-01651-BM]
Related: [-]
7 7 COMPLAINT AND REDACTED AFFIDAVIT (Pendergrass, C) [5:24-mj-01651-BM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/24/2024 as to Kevin Day Dunlow. (Pendergrass, C) [5:24-mj-01651-BM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
Set Hearing as to Kevin Day Dunlow: Initial Appearance set for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM in New Bern Hearing Room before US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank. (Grady, B.) [5:24-mj-01651-BM]
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMENT as to Kevin Day Dunlow (1) count(s) 1-3, 4, 5-7, 8. The foreperson's signature has been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. The unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
10 10 Unredacted Document9 Indictment (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
11 11 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Kevin Day Dunlow (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]