District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amit P Mehta
Case #: 1:24-cv-01695
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
ENCORE VET GROUP LLC
Represented By
Leslie Paul Machado
O'Hagan Meyer, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH
8201 16TH STREET APT 503
SILVER SPRING, MD 20910
Represented By
Ari Micah Wilkenfeld
Alan Lescht & Associates, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC.
Terminated: 07/22/2024
4105 BRANDYWINE ST. NW
WASHINGTON, DC 20016
Represented By
Leslie Paul Machado
O'Hagan Meyer, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
21 21 17 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 04/29 6:56 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH. (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/15 2:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than April 29, 2025. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/15/2025. (lcapm3) Modified on 4/15/2025 to correct event title (zakb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/14 12:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH. (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/14 10:55 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH. (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/14 5:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting19 Consent Motion to Extend Deadlines. Plaintiff's response shall be due on or before April 15, 2025. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/14/2025. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 motion Dismiss Tue 03/11 5:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ENCORE VET GROUP LLC.(Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit email,
Att: 3 Exhibit decision,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/10 10:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss the amended complaint by March 17, 2025. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/10/2025. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
17 17 misc Status Report Sun 03/09 3:34 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH, ENCORE VET GROUP LLC. (Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 02/24 4:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Settlement Conference held on 2/24/2025. (lclb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/10 12:33 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2025 at 12:30 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. (lclb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/04 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. (lclb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Fri 01/10 5:10 PM
STATUS REPORT by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH. (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 01/10 6:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 11, 2025, which updates the court on the status of their settlement efforts and proposes a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/10/2025. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
order Status Report Order ~Util - Case Stayed Tue 11/12 12:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER. This matter shall remain stayed until January 10, 2025. On that date, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report that updates the court on the status of settlement, unless they earlier file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/12/2024. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 11/11 11:09 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ENCORE VET GROUP LLC. (Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
14 14 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office) Tue 10/08 12:23 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation with Circuit Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 10/8/2024. (lclb)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Mediation Tue 10/08 8:26 AM
MOTION for Mediation by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH. (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 08/16 10:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/11/2024 (zakb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion for Mediation Tue 08/13 3:58 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties'10 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Refer Case to a Magistrate Judge for an Early Settlement Conference and granting11 Joint Motion for Referral to Mediation. The court hereby refers this matter to the Mediation Program of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 11, 2024, which addresses: (a) the status of the mediation and settlement discussions; (b) whether the parties believe they would benefit from additional time for mediation and/or settlement discussions; and (c) any other information that the parties believe the court should be aware of. If the parties reach an impasse or a settlement before November 11, 2024, they shall promptly inform the court. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/13/2024. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/04 4:55 PM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui for mediation. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
11 11 motion Mediation Wed 08/07 5:03 PM
MOTION for Mediation by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH. (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
order .Order Mon 08/05 2:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The court is in receipt of the parties Joint Motion to Stay, ECF No. 10, which requests a referral to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. This court's practice is not to refer matters for settlement to Magistrate Judge absent good cause, because of their busy dockets. The parties shall advise the court by August 8, 2024, whether they would accept a referral to the courts mediation program. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/05/2024. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/05 3:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' response to Court order due by 8/8/2024. (zakb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
10 10 motion Stay Settlement Thu 08/01 10:54 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay all deadlines , Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference referral by ENCORE VET GROUP LLC.(Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 07/25 11:23 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ENCORE VET GROUP LLC.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
Monday, July 22, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/25 11:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENCORE VET GROUP LLC with Jury Demand filed by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH.(mg) (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/25/2024) Summons
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 07/22 9:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER Plaintiff's granting7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint filed at ECF No. 7-2 shall hereby be the operative pleading in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/22/2024. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Fri 07/19 1:10 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH.(Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/17 1:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2024. Answer due by 8/9/2024. (zakb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Tue 07/16 6:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's6 Consent motion to extend defendant's time to file responsive pleading once plaintiff files an amended complaint. Dr. Harfoush shall file his amended complaint on or before July 19, 2024. Encore's response to the amended complaint shall be filed on or before August 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/16/2024. (lcapm3)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to Mon 07/15 10:15 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC..(Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Mon 07/15 10:06 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC. (Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Paul Machado on behalf of FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC. (Machado, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 06/28 11:20 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC. served on 6/24/2024, answer due 7/15/2024 (Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 06/13 10:47 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC.. (zcb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/13 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT against FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10958005) filed by MUHAMMAD HARFOUSH.(Wilkenfeld, Ari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons