Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:24-cv-01699
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:2675 Federal Tort Claims Act - Disposition by Agency Req
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 28, 2025
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Rob Shriver
Represented By
Kelly M Marzullo
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Brent W. Amos
15812 Voelker Lane
Elgin, TX 78621


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 10:19 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file a Joint Status Report within 14 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/7/2025. (c/m 5/7/2025 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 misc Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 04/29 8:59 AM
Case transferred in from District of United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit; Case Number 25-1331 Original file with documents numbered 1-15, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Entries,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet
Friday, December 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Fri 12/20 3:36 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/20/2024. (c/m 12/20/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Transfer Case Fri 12/20 12:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Rob Shriver(Marzullo, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference Fri 12/20 12:00 PM
Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2024 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 12/20 3:47 PM
Case transferred to United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/11 1:20 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for December 20, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss11 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS. Instructions for the call will be provided. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/11/2024 (c/m 12/11/2024 - bw5s)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 respm Response Tue 12/03 9:02 AM
RESPONSE and Request for Hearing re11 Notice (Other) filed by Brent W. Amos.(ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tab 1,
Att: 2 Tab 2,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/26 9:45 AM
NOTICE by Rob Shriver of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Marzullo, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/13 11:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rob Shriver, filed by Brent W. Amos. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tab 1,
Att: 2 Tab 2,
Att: 3 Tab 3,
Att: 4 Tab 4,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service,
Att: 6 Envelope
Monday, October 21, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 10/21 1:35 PM
ORDER granting8 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/21/2024. (c/m 10/21/2024 ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/21/2024 (ybs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time Fri 10/18 6:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Rob Shriver(Marzullo, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 misc Supplement Thu 09/05 2:36 PM
Supplement to6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Brent W. Amos(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/30 2:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brent W. Amos. Rob Shriver served on 8/20/2024, answer due 9/10/2024.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 07/10 3:55 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Rob Shriver, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(c/m 7/10/2024 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 2:29 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide a summons for Defendant to the Clerk for signature and seal; directing Plaintiff to serve Defendant by September 9, 2024; directing Plaintiff to notify the Court of any changes to his address. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/3/2024. (c/m 7/3/2024 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Thu 06/13 11:17 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Brent W. Amos. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
2 2 order Case Management Order Wed 06/12 2:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/12/2024. (c/m 6/12/2024 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Rob Shriver ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 2051.), filed by Brent W. Amos.(slss, Deputy Clerk) (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Receipt,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 US Marshals Forms
Att: 6 (6/12/2024) Exhibits