Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Sharion Aycock
Referred: David A Sanders
Case #: 1:24-cv-00112
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:45 AM CST
Defendant
America's Car Mart, Inc.
Represented By
Morgan Spivey Hart
Daniel Coker Horton & Bell, P.A.
contact info
Timothy Michael Peeples
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell - Oxford
contact info
Plaintiff
Fantasia Brown
Represented By
Jane Ashley Watson
Watson & Norris PLLC
contact info
Louis H Watson, Jr
Louis H. Watson, Jr.
contact info
Robert N. Norris
Watson & Norris, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
28 28 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/15 1:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by reason of settlement. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/15/2025. (tjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/15 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Settlement Conference held on 5/14/2025. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 service Proof of Service of Subpoena Thu 05/01 3:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA served on Cadence Bank on 04/25/2025 by Morgan Spivey Hart on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc.. (Hart, Morgan)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Proof of Service of Subpoena Thu 05/01 3:26 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA served on Express Employment Professionals on 04/25/2025 by Morgan Spivey Hart on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc.. (Hart, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/15 11:33 AM
NOTICE by Morgan Spivey Hart on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc. of Issuance (Hart, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoenas
Thursday, March 27, 2025
23 23 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 03/27 9:05 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fantasia Brown by Timothy Michael Peeples on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc. (Peeples, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Conference Wed 03/05 11:08 AM
NOTICE Resetting Conference:Telephonic Settlement Conference reset for 5/14/2025 at 1:30 PM from Aberdeen Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/03 3:11 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Louis H Watson, Jr; Robert N. Norris and Jane Ashley Watson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/3/25. (cs) (Main Document 21 replaced on 3/3/2025 with correct pdf) (jla)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/10 11:57 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fantasia Brown. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 02/07 4:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fantasia Brown. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Service Mon 01/13 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Production by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Fantasia Brown to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Service Mon 01/13 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Fantasia Brown to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/10 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of discovery requests by Timothy Michael Peeples on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc.. (Peeples, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Trial Wed 11/13 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 12/8/2025 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (Est. 3-5 days.) (tjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 order Case Management Order Tue 11/12 9:27 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in Judge Sanders Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2025. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/28/2025. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/25/2025. Motions due by 6/13/2025. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2025 at 10:00 AM from Aberdeen Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/12/2024. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Service Thu 11/07 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Fantasia Brown to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Service Thu 11/07 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Fantasia Brown to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
11 11 minutes Case Management Conference Mon 11/04 2:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/31/2024. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/30 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Spivey Hart on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc. (Hart, Morgan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Service Wed 10/30 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Timothy Michael Peeples on behalf of America's Car Mart, Inc.. (Peeples, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/28 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane Ashley Watson on behalf of Fantasia Brown (Watson, Jane)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Service Fri 10/18 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Fantasia Brown to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Mon 09/23 10:37 AM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1:Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 at 9:00 AM from Aberdeen Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 10/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/23/2024. (jf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/13 9:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by America's Car Mart, Inc.. (Peeples, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/23 10:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; America's Car Mart, Inc. waiver sent on 7/22/2024. (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Fri 07/12 8:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to America's Car Mart, Inc. (jla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 06/13 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Fantasia Brown (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 06/12 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to America's Car Mart, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2400581, filed by Fantasia Brown. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Wed 06/12 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
Related: [-]