Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi H Johnson
Referred: Michael T Parker
Case #: 3:24-cv-00344
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Jul 25, 2024
Case in other court:County Court of Madison County, MS, 45CO1:24-cv-620
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 2:43 AM CST
Defendant
Tony L Gines
Represented By
Edward Blackmon, Jr
Blackmon & Blackmon Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ultraviolet CDE Sanitation LLC
Represented By
Edward Blackmon, Jr
Blackmon & Blackmon Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
UVC Cleaning Systems Inc
Represented By
Chelsea Gascho Walker
Young Wells Williams, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 07/31 10:18 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt from Madison County Circuit Court Clerk filed. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Thu 07/25 5:14 PM
Letter to Anita Wray, Clerk of County Court of Madison County, transmitting Certified Order of Remand and docket sheet. (CO)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 07/25 5:08 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Remand to State Court - The Court REMANDS the case to the County Court of Madison County. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 07/25/2024 (CO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 2 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 07/24 2:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tony L Gines, Ultraviolet CDE Sanitation LLC (Blackmon, Edward)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 07/24 9:03 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's5 Motion to Remand was due July 23, 2024. The Court orders Defendants either to file a response or confess that the motion should be granted no later than July 26, 2024. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 7/24/2024. (KLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/11 9:19 AM
ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the Motion5 to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 11, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
7 7 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 07/09 10:13 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by UVC Cleaning Systems Inc (Walker, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/09 9:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UVC Cleaning Systems Inc (Walker, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs motion Remand to State Court Tue 07/09 9:49 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by UVC Cleaning Systems Inc(Walker, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
4 4 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/19 11:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ultraviolet CDE Sanitation LLC (Blackmon, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/18 10:23 AM
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 18, 2024. (ST)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
2 2 4 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/17 11:03 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants by Tony L Gines, Ultraviolet CDE Sanitation LLC.(Blackmon, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Wed 06/12 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tony L Gines, Ultraviolet CDE Sanitation LLC from County Court of Madison County, case number 45CO1:24-cv-00620. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 8691) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Search Summary State of Michigan Corporations Division,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - State Court Record,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet