Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 5:24-cv-00295
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 order Judgment Tue 01/07 3:42 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/7/2025. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 01/03 3:31 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for EAJA Attorney's Fees; directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $4,260.19 in attorney's fees. Signed by Senior Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/3/2025. (SRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 motion Attorney Fees Thu 01/02 3:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act by Dalia Chinchilla.(Atkins, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Fee Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Time Records & Calculations,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Consumer Price Index,
Att: 5 Exhibit D- Affidavit of Sarah Atkins,
Att: 6 Exhibit E- Affidavit of George C. Piemonte,
Att: 7 Exhibit F- Affidavit of Ellen Moyle,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
15 15 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/09 8:05 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Judgment Wed 10/09 8:04 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Dalia Chinchilla against Commissioner of Social Security. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JK) . Modified attachment on 10/9/2024 (JK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Brief - Social Security - Plaintiff Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Tue 10/08 3:00 PM
ORDER granting 12 Commissioner's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment with Remand; remanding case to the Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further action; directing the clerk to enter judgment and close the file; providing instructions to plaintiff's counsel regarding attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/8/2024. (SRW)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Remand to Agency Tue 10/08 1:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration by Commissioner of Social Security. (Abt, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
11 11 motion Brief - Social Security - Plaintiff Wed 09/11 1:20 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF in opposition to the Commissioner's decision filed by Dalia Chinchilla.(Atkins, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Educational Requirements of Order Clerk Food and Beverage
Thursday, August 15, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order Thu 08/15 5:46 PM
ORDER regarding Briefing Format and Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions effective December 1, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 8/15/2024. (NK)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
9 9 misc Social security transcript Mon 08/12 10:23 AM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings by Commissioner of Social Security.(Abt, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Appendix,
Att: 3 Appendix,
Att: 4 Appendix,
Att: 5 Appendix,
Att: 6 Appendix,
Att: 7 Appendix,
Att: 8 Appendix,
Att: 9 Appendix,
Att: 10 Appendix,
Att: 11 Appendix,
Att: 12 Appendix
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/03 1:49 PM
ORDER granting doc. 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), which the Court construes as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 7/3/2024. (NMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
7 7 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/02 12:46 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 5:24-cv-295-TJC-LLL. Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (NAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of substitution of AUSA Tue 06/18 3:21 PM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Ellen Veronica Abt substituting for Nadine DeLuca Elder. (Abt, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/12 4:17 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:24-cv-295-TJC-PRL. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (TNP)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/12 2:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dalia Chinchilla. (Atkins, Sarah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 06/12 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sarah Elizabeth Atkins on behalf of Dalia Chinchilla. Lead Counsel: Sarah Atkins. (Atkins, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/12 2:22 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dalia Chinchilla. (Atkins, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley. The plaintiff declines consent to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Dalia Chinchilla.(Atkins, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet