California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-04969
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, BC687062
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 12:31 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Amir M Nassihi
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Amy Patricia Maclear
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
NGP Motors, Inc.
Plaintiff
Haley OBrien
Represented By
R Roger Kirnos
Knight Law Group LLP
contact info
Jacob William Cutler
Knight Law Group
contact info
Steve Mikhov
Knight Law Group LLP
contact info
Russell W Higgins
Knight Law Group, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaun OBrien
Represented By
R Roger Kirnos
Knight Law Group LLP
contact info
Jacob William Cutler
Knight Law Group
contact info
Steve Mikhov
Knight Law Group LLP
contact info
Russell W Higgins
Knight Law Group, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 09/11 11:21 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob William Cutler counsel for Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien. Adding Jacob William Cutler as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Haley OBrien and Shaun OBrien. (Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Haley OBrien(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Shaun OBrien(pty:pla))(Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
16 16 order Dismissing Case Thu 08/29 3:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has been advised that this action has been settled15 . The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
15 15 notice Settlement Thu 08/22 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) filed by Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien. (Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/06 1:54 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court set a Scheduling Conference for August 9, 2024. The Order requires the parties to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by 14 days before the scheduling conference. See Order § I. As of the date of this order, no report has been filed, nor have the parties filed anything indicating why no report has been filed. The Scheduling Conference is therefore VACATED.Although all partiesand the Courtare responsible for the timely progress of a case, a plaintiff, as the party who filed an action, bears the primary responsibility for ensuring compliance with deadlines that apply to them. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution given the parties failure to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. An appropriate response may be a Notice of Settlement, or a declaration explaining why the Joint Rule 26(f) Report was not filed along with a Stipulation of the parties and a Proposed Order to reset the Scheduling Conference. The Court informs the parties that it usually enters scheduling orders based on the Joint Rule 26(f) Report without conducting a conference with counsel. Plaintiffs Response must be filed by August 23, 2024. If no response is filed by that date, the case will be dismissed without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/16 12:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF THE 30-DAY DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A MOTION TO REMAND TO AUGUST 5, 2024 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation12 : The Court APPROVES the Parties' stipulation that Defendant may not raise the 30-day remand rule for any remand motion that Plaintiffs file by August 5, 2024. (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
12 12 4 pgs stip Order Fri 07/12 10:18 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Order to Extend the 30 Day Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Motion to Remand to August 5, 2024 filed by Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien.(Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting an Extension to the 30-Day Deadline to File a Motion to Remand to August 5, 2024
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 07/02 2:48 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney R Roger Kirnos counsel for Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien. Adding Roger Kirnos as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Haley O'Brien and Shaun O'Brien. (Attorney R Roger Kirnos added to party Haley OBrien(pty:pla), Attorney R Roger Kirnos added to party Shaun OBrien(pty:pla))(Kirnos, R)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 06/27 8:44 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Russell W Higgins counsel for Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien. Adding Russell Higgins as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Haley O'Brien and Shaun O'Brien. (Attorney Russell W Higgins added to party Haley OBrien(pty:pla), Attorney Russell W Higgins added to party Shaun OBrien(pty:pla))(Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 06/21 10:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Related Case(s)4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on June 13, 2024. (Maclear, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 06/14 8:58 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. set for 8/9/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 06/14 8:56 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 06/13 6:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 06/13 6:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Wed 06/12 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation. Related Case(s): 18-1411 DMG (PLAx), 2814-AB (PVCx)(Maclear, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 06/12 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation, identifying State Street Corporation, Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Black Rock, Inc., The Vanguard Group. (Maclear, Amy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 06/12 5:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation. (Maclear, Amy)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/12 5:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number BC687062 Receipt No: ACACDC-37647980 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - FAC,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order to Remand,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Request for Dismissal,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 06/13 6:19 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company, NGP Motors, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/18/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/13 6:23 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company, NGP Motors, Inc. amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiffs Haley OBrien, Shaun OBrien. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/10/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 06/13 6:30 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/6/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]