New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:24-cv-04521
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
$ytrading616
Defendant
Bagsmalles.com
Defendant
Bstsneaker.com
Defendant
Bstsneakers.com
Defendant
Buykicks.me
Defendant
Carlsneaker.com
Defendant
Cocoshoesvip.com
Defendant
Ddkicks.net
Defendant
Gdleyu Inc.
Defendant
Hotkicks.cc
Defendant
Hotkicks.org
Defendant
Joom E-Commerce Company Limited
Defendant
Ming Fu Hong Trading Limited
Defendant
Mr. Wang
Defendant
Rimisneaker.us
Defendant
Shiby NY Inc.
Defendant
Songsneaker.com
Defendant
Stockxshoes.com
Defendant
Stockxshoesvip.com
Defendant
$DedianFang
Defendant
$kaideninc616
Defendant
888kicks.ru
Defendant
ABC Companies
Defendant
Bmlin.net
Defendant
Bo Ying Trading Hong Kong Limited
Defendant
Bombline.cc
Defendant
Bombline.la
Defendant
Casnda Corp Limited-B2c
Defendant
Wai Chan
Defendant
Clothswmalls.com
Defendant
Clubkickz.com
Defendant
Cnfashionclub.com
Defendant
CocoShoes.Net
Defendant
Coolkicksmall.com
Defendant
Coptop
Defendant
Coptop.net
Defendant
Coptop.ru
Defendant
Crewkick.net
Defendant
Crewkicks.org
Defendant
Dmsneaker.com
Defendant
Dopesneaker.co
Defendant
Dunksticks.org
Defendant
EFX Fashion Inc.
Defendant
EKO DG Trading Inc
Defendant
Ebuysneakers.com
Defendant
Flightkickz.cn
Defendant
Flightkickz.com
Defendant
Footskick.ru
Defendant
Gmkim.vn.ua
Defendant
Hewitt2303.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Hotkickss.ru
Defendant
Houyw.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Hypeboost.Store
Defendant
Hypeboost.ru
Defendant
Hypeboost.shop
Defendant
Hypeboosts.com
Defendant
Hypeboosts.ru
Defendant
Hypeshoes.co
Defendant
Hypeunique.com
Defendant
Hypeunique.is
Defendant
Hypeunique.me
Defendant
Jaskicks.ru
Defendant
Jdfoot.co
Defendant
Jiemao Commerce Co. Ltd
Defendant
John Does 1-100
Defendant
Jordonkicks.org
Defendant
Kickcentral.me
Defendant
Kickmax.ru
Defendant
Kickscentral.cc
Defendant
Kicksgate.com
Defendant
Kickwho.cc
Defendant
Kickwho.xyz
Defendant
Kickzlucas.com
Defendant
Killone.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Lgrose.ru
Defendant
Guoxiong Lin
Defendant
Lkkiks.com
Defendant
Luckshoes.ru
Defendant
M1sneakers.com
Defendant
Mangomee.co
Defendant
Mangomeee.com
Defendant
Mika Technology Co. Limited
Defendant
Misstylea
Defendant
Monicasneaker.cc
Defendant
Muksstore.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
One Pick (HK) Limited
Defendant
Peinabaxnyj
Defendant
Perfectkicks.top
Defendant
Pkshoes.store
Defendant
Pkstockx.cc
Defendant
Popkicks.org
Defendant
Popshoe.org
Defendant
Pyn*Cnfashion Club
Defendant
Rarerapsneaker.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Rarerepclothing.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Rimisneaker.CC
Defendant
Rimisneaker.Ru
Defendant
Rsneakers.fun;
Defendant
SP Xylar Studio
Defendant
Sharesneaker.us
Defendant
Sharesneaker.vip
Defendant
Sharesneakers.us
Defendant
Sharesneakers.vip
Defendant
Sing Ying Trading Limited
Defendant
Sneakerwill.shop
Defendant
Solenlaces.com
Defendant
Star EFX Fashion Inc.
Defendant
Stockxkicks.com
Defendant
Stockxpro.com
Defendant
Stockxpro.vip
Defendant
Stockxprovip.com
Defendant
Stylesneaks.com
Defendant
Supersneakers.vip
Defendant
Taosneakers.com
Defendant
Timsneakers.com
Defendant
Uabat.xyz
Defendant
Uabatman.com
Defendant
Ubuysneakers.com
Defendant
Ulrica688.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Vkomall
Defendant
Wawone.com
Defendant
Wtp*stepsupshoes
Defendant
Xblo594.x.yupoo.com
Defendant
Xylar.co
Defendant
Yzynation.com
Defendant
Xianguo Zhou
Defendant
ln5factory.com
Plaintiff
Converse Inc.
Represented By
Howard Sean Hogan
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Robert L Weigel
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Colleen O'Leary Devine
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Plaintiff
Nike, Inc.
Represented By
Howard Sean Hogan
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Robert L Weigel
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Colleen O'Leary Devine
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
39 39 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/16 11:33 AM
ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS, Defendant Shiby NY Inc. is granted until May 23, 2025 to move to file an answer, notwithstanding its earlier default. Plaintiffs will continue taking discovery. Fact discovery concludes on July 18, 2025. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint no later than July 18, 2025. The parties shall next appear on July 18, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. for a status conference, which will be held via the following call-in number. Call-in number: 646-453-4442, Access code: 784 535 450#. Finally, no later than July 15, 2025, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2025., Fact Discovery due by 7/18/2025., Motions due by 5/23/2025., Telephone Conference set for 7/18/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/16/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/16 10:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 5/16/2025, All Defendants.( Status Conference set for 7/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael R Curran on behalf of Shiby NY Inc...(Curran, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
37 37 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/07 11:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference scheduled for May 16, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 646-453-4442, Access code: 702 317 591#. Finally, pursuant to my Order of March 5, 2025, no later than May 13, 2025 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/7/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
36 36 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/05 2:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference scheduled for March 7, 2025 is adjourned to May 16, 2025. An order with the dial-in information for that telephone conference will be issued at a later date. No later than May 13, 2025, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/5/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
35 35 order Memo Endorsement Mon 01/06 6:11 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:34 Letter, filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc. ENDORSEMENT So Ordered to all relief requested. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/6/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/06 6:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 5/9/2025. (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
34 34 3 pgs misc Letter Mon 12/23 2:33 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert L. Weigel dated December 23, 2024 re: continuation of discovery. Document filed by Nike, Inc., Converse Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Rule 54(b) Motion, ECF No. 112
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/10 6:33 PM
ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: In light of Defendants' failure to appear to date, the status conference scheduled for Friday, December 13, 2024 is adjourned to Friday, March 7, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs are directed to proceed with a summary judgment motion, noting the default, to be filed by January 10, 2025. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/10/2025., Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
32 32 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/30 4:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on December 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 646-453-4442. Conference ID: 492 082 246#. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 10 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than December 10, 2024, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/30/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
31 31 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 09/19 7:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order signed July 3, 2024 and all attachments served on Defendants Network 29 and Network 50 on July 30, 2024. Service was made by WhatsApp. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - WhatsApp Message to Network 29,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - WhatsApp Message to Network 50
30 30 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 09/19 6:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order signed July 3, 2024 and all attachments served on All Defendants EXCEPT FOR Network 29 and Network 50 on July 12, 2024. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Service Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Bounceback Chart
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 09/19 6:00 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Howard Sean Hogan on behalf of Converse Inc., Nike, Inc.. New Address: Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, 1700 M Street, NW, Washington, DC, USA 20036, 202-467-0539..(Hogan, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
28 28 order Preliminary Injunction Fri 07/12 5:39 PM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants, their officers, directors, agents, employees, representatives, successors or assigns, and all persons acting in concert or in participation with any of them from are restrained and enjoined from: using Plaintiffs' Marks, or any reproduction, counterfeit, copy, or colorable imitation of Plaintiffs' Marks, or any mark confusingly similar thereto or likely to dilute or detract from the Plaintiffs' Marks, in connection with manufacturing, distributing, delivering, shipping, importing, exporting, advertising, marketing, promoting, selling or offering for sale Counterfeit Products or any other products confusingly similar to Plaintiffs' Products, or that otherwise bear, contain, display, or utilize any of the Plaintiffs' Marks; As further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/3/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
27 27 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 07/03 2:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Temporary Restraing Order entered 6/13/2024 and Summons & Complaint and all attachments served on Defendant Network 29 on June 28, 2024. Service was made by WhatsApp. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - WhatsApp Message to Network 29,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - WhatsApp Message from Network 29
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
order Order Tue 07/02 10:01 AM
ORDER. The TRO is hereby extended to still be in effect until Wednesday, July 3, 2024, and will dissolve if the Court does not issue plaintiffs' proposed preliminary injunction order to be filed that day. Any request for a further extension or other relief must be made to the chambers of Judge Hellerstein, with whom this case remains. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
26 26 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 07/01 9:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint with Exhibits and Order to Show Cause served on All Defendants EXCEPT FOR Shiby NY Inc., Star EFX Fashion Inc., GDLEYU Inc., and EFX Fashion Inc. (these four defendants served via the New York State Secretary of State) and pkshoes.store, bombline.la and coolkicksmall.com on June 24, 2024. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Service Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Bounceback Chart
25 25 service Affidavit of Service Other Mon 07/01 4:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Temporary Restraining Notices (2), Memorandum of Law, Declarations (with Exhibits) of Joe Pallett, Sara Perles, Robert L. Weigel and Robert Holmes served on Shiby NY Inc., Star EFX Fashion Inc., GDLEYU Inc., and EFX Fashion Inc. on June 21, 2024. Service was accepted by New York State Secretary of State, service agent. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
minutes Show Cause Hearing Wed 07/10 12:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/1/2024. Application to continue TRO is granted. (Kotowski, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Fri 06/28 2:50 PM
ORDER TO VACATE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that although this case was previously referred to the Magistrate Judge for general pretrial and dispositive motions, the order, Dkt. No. 21 shall be vacated, and this case shall remain with Judge Hellerstein. This does not disturb the scheduling order dated June 26, 2024, Dkt. No. 22. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/27/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/28 12:31 PM
NOTICE of COUNSEL TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS AT HEARING re:22 Scheduling Order,,, Set Hearings,,. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 06/26 4:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The hearing scheduled for July 1, 2024 at 4:30 p.m. will proceed before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in Courtroom 14B at 500 Pearl Street. No later than June 28, 2024 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall file a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED., ( Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2024 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/26/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
21 21 order Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/25 6:15 PM
AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for limited purpose (e.g., dispositive motion, preliminary injunction) General pre trial, TRO, dispositive motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 06/21 12:27 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
19 19 12 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Tue 06/18 11:19 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
18 18 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Mon 06/17 6:00 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit 1 - Rider A
17 17 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 4:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to $DedianFang, $kaideninc616, $ytrading616, 888kicks.ru, Bagsmalles.com, Bmlin.net, Bo Ying Trading Hong Kong Limited, Bombline.cc, Bombline.la, Bstsneaker.com, Bstsneakers.com, Buykicks.me, Carlsneaker.com, Casnda Corp Limited-B2c, Wai Chan, Clothswmalls.com, Clubkickz.com, Cnfashionclub.com, CocoShoes.Net, Cocoshoesvip.com, Coolkicksmall.com, Coptop, Coptop.net, Coptop.ru, Crewkick.net, Crewkicks.org, Ddkicks.net, Dmsneaker.com, Dopesneaker.co, Dunksticks.org, EFX Fashion Inc., EKO DG Trading Inc, Ebuysneakers.com, Flightkickz.cn, Flightkickz.com, Footskick.ru, Gdleyu Inc., Gmkim.vn.ua, Hewitt2303.x.yupoo.com, Hotkicks.cc, Hotkicks.org, Hotkickss.ru, Houyw.x.yupoo.com, Hypeboost.Store, Hypeboost.ru, Hypeboost.shop, Hypeboosts.com, Hypeboosts.ru, Hypeshoes.co, Hypeunique.com, Hypeunique.is, Hypeunique.me, Jaskicks.ru, Jdfoot.co, Jiemao Commerce Co. Ltd, Joom E-Commerce Company Limited, Jordonkicks.org, Kickcentral.me, Kickmax.ru, Kickscentral.cc, Kicksgate.com, Kickwho.cc, Kickwho.xyz, Kickzlucas.com, Killone.x.yupoo.com, Lgrose.ru, Guoxiong Lin, Lkkiks.com, Luckshoes.ru, M1sneakers.com, Mangomee.co, Mangomeee.com, Mika Technology Co. Limited, Ming Fu Hong Trading Limited, Misstylea, Monicasneaker.cc, Mr. Wang, Muksstore.x.yupoo.com, One Pick (HK) Limited, Peinabaxnyj, Perfectkicks.top, Pkshoes.store, Pkstockx.cc, Popkicks.org, Popshoe.org, PynCnfashion Club, Rarerapsneaker.x.yupoo.com, Rarerepclothing.x.yupoo.com, Rimisneaker.CC, Rimisneaker.Ru, Rimisneaker.us, Rsneakers.fun;, SP Xylar Studio, Sharesneaker.us, Sharesneaker.vip, Sharesneakers.us, Sharesneakers.vip, Shiby NY Inc., Sing Ying Trading Limited, Sneakerwill.shop, Solenlaces.com, Songsneaker.com, Star EFX Fashion Inc., Stockxkicks.com, Stockxpro.com, Stockxpro.vip, Stockxprovip.com, Stockxshoes.com, Stockxshoesvip.com, Stylesneaks.com, Supersneakers.vip, Taosneakers.com, Timsneakers.com, Uabat.xyz, Uabatman.com, Ubuysneakers.com, Ulrica688.x.yupoo.com, Vkomall, Wawone.com, Wtpstepsupshoes, Xblo594.x.yupoo.com, Xylar.co, Yzynation.com, Xianguo Zhou, ln5factory.com..(jgo) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/17/2024) (jgo)
Related: [-]
16 16 4 pgs misc Bond Mon 06/17 2:26 PM
UNDERTAKING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BOND # 3522681 in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
15 15 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 06/14 5:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to $DedianFang, $kaideninc616, $ytrading616, 888kicks.ru, Bagsmalles.com, Bmlin.net, Bo Ying Trading Hong Kong Limited, Bombline.cc, Bombline.la, Bstsneaker.com, Bstsneakers.com, Buykicks.me, Carlsneaker.com, Casnda Corp Limited-B2c, Wai Chan, Clothswmalls.com, Clubkickz.com, Cnfashionclub.com, Cocoshoesvip.com, Coolkicksmall.com, Coptop, Coptop.net, Coptop.ru, Crewkick.net, Crewkicks.org, Ddkicks.net, Dopesneaker.co, Dunksticks.org, EFX Fashion Inc., EKO DG Trading Inc, Ebuysneakers.com, Flightkickz.cn, Flightkickz.com, Footskick.ru, Gdleyu Inc., Gmkim.vn.ua, Hewitt2303.x.yupoo.com, Hotkicks.cc, Hotkicks.org, Hotkickss.ru, Houyw.x.yupoo.com, Hypeboost.ru, Hypeboost.shop, Hypeboosts.com, Hypeboosts.ru, Hypeshoes.co, Hypeunique.com, Hypeunique.is, Hypeunique.me, Jaskicks.ru, Jdfoot.co, Jiemao Commerce Co. Ltd, Joom E-Commerce Company Limited, Jordonkicks.org, Kickcentral.me, Kickmax.ru, Kickscentral.cc, Kicksgate.com, Kickwho.cc, Kickwho.xyz, Kickzlucas.com, Killone.x.yupoo.com, Lgrose.ru, Guoxiong Lin, Lkkiks.com, Luckshoes.ru, M1sneakers.com, Mangomee.co, Mangomeee.com, Mika Technology Co. Limited, Ming Fu Hong Trading Limited, Misstylea, Monicasneaker.cc, Mr. Wang, Muksstore.x.yupoo.com, One Pick (HK) Limited, Peinabaxnyj, Perfectkicks.top, Pkshoes.store, Pkstockx.cc, Popkicks.org, Popshoe.org, PynCnfashion Club, Rarerapsneaker.x.yupoo.com, Rarerepclothing.x.yupoo.com, Rimisneaker.us, Rsneakers.fun;, SP Xylar Studio, Sharesneaker.us, Sharesneaker.vip, Sharesneakers.us, Sharesneakers.vip, Shiby NY Inc., Sing Ying Trading Limited, Sneakerwill.shop, Songsneaker.com, Star EFX Fashion Inc., Stockxkicks.com, Stockxpro.com, Stockxpro.vip, Stockxprovip.com, Stockxshoes.com, Stockxshoesvip.com, Stylesneaks.com, Supersneakers.vip, Taosneakers.com, Timsneakers.com, Uabat.xyz, Uabatman.com, Ubuysneakers.com, Ulrica688.x.yupoo.com, Vkomall, Wawone.com, Wtpstepsupshoes, Xblo594.x.yupoo.com, Xylar.co, Yzynation.com, Xianguo Zhou, ln5factory.com, Dmsneaker.com, Solenlaces.com, CocoShoes.Net, Rimisneaker.CC, Rimisneaker.Ru, re:1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 06/14 3:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert L Weigel to RE-FILE Document No. 13 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Type each defendant's name on docket entry for the summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
14 14 84 pgs order Temporary Restraining Order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/13 4:40 PM
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO DISABLE CERTAIN WEBSITES, ASSET RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants appear to show cause on July 1, 2024, at 4:30 p.m., or as soon thereafter as counsel can be heard, before United States District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein in Courtroom 14D of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, why an order pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Section 34 of the Lanham Act should not be entered granting Plaintiffs a preliminary injunction as follows: Restraining and enjoining Defendants, their officers, directors, agents, employees, representatives, successors or assigns, and all persons acting in concert or in participation with any of them from: As further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' answering papers to Plaintiffs' Order to Show Cause, if any, shall be electronically filed with the Clerk of this Court and served upon Plaintiffs' counsel by delivering copies thereof to the offices of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 200 Park Avenue, 47th Floor, New York, NY 10166-0193, Attention: Robert L. Weigel, Esq., by no later than June 24, 2024, with any reply by Plaintiffs to be electronically filed and served by June 27, 2024. As further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any third party that has received proper notice of this Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(d)(2), and requires clarifications as to its duties, if any, under this Order, may make an application to this Court, with notice to Plaintiffs' counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/13/2024) ( Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2024 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein., Responses due by 6/24/2024, Replies due by 6/27/2024.) (ks)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/13 11:07 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to See Rider A, re:1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Thu 06/13 6:33 AM
DECLARATION of ROBERT HOLMES in Support re:5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 152 pgs Exhibit 1 to 7,
Att: 2 Exhibit 8 to 9,
Att: 3 Exhibit 10,
Att: 4 Exhibit 11 to 14,
Att: 5 30 pgs Exhibit 15 to 19,
Att: 6 Exhibit 20 - 24,
Att: 7 Exhibit 25 to 26,
Att: 8 Exhibit 27,
Att: 9 Exhibit 28 to 32,
Att: 10 Exhibit 33 to 34,
Att: 11 Exhibit 35 to 37,
Att: 12 Exhibit 38 to 42,
Att: 13 Exhibit 43 to 46,
Att: 14 Exhibit 47 to 50,
Att: 15 Exhibit 51 to 52,
Att: 16 Exhibit 53 to 60
11 11 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Thu 06/13 1:16 AM
DECLARATION of SARA PERLES in Support re:5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2016 Certification,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - 2017 Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants Networks,
Att: 4 8 pgs Exhibit 4 - Infringing Websites by Network,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Infringing Social Media,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Known Email Addresses,
Att: 7 5 pgs Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Known Names,
Att: 8 Exhibit Nike Marks,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Converse Marks,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Lists of Goods,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Appearance of Mark by Category of Good,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Network 1 Images,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Network 2 Images,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Network 3 Images,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Network 4 Images,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Network 5 Images,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Network 6 Images,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Network 7 Images,
Att: 19 16 pgs Exhibit 19 - Network 8 Images,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Network 9 Images,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - Network 10 Images,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Network 11 Images,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Network 12 Images,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Network 13 Images,
Att: 25 26 pgs Exhibit 25 - Network 14 Images,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Network 15 Images,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Network 16 Images,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Network 17 Images,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - Network 18 Images,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Network 19 Images,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Network 20 Images,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Network 21 Images, Part 1,
Att: 33 Exhibit 32 - Network 21 Images, Part 2,
Att: 34 Exhibit 33 - Network 22 Images,
Att: 35 Exhibit 34 - Network 23 Images,
Att: 36 Exhibit 35 - Network 24 Images,
Att: 37 Exhibit 36 - Network 25 Images,
Att: 38 Exhibit 37 - Network 26 Images, Part 1,
Att: 39 Exhibit 37 - Network 26 Images, Part 2,
Att: 40 Exhibit 38 - 37 - Network 27 Images, Part 1,
Att: 41 Exhibit 38 - Network 27 Images, Part 2,
Att: 42 Exhibit 39 - Network 28 Images,
Att: 43 Exhibit 40 - Network 29 Images, Part 1,
Att: 44 Exhibit 40 - Network 29 Images, Part 2,
Att: 45 Exhibit 41 - Network 30 Images,
Att: 46 Exhibit 42 - Network 31 Images,
Att: 47 Exhibit 43 - Network 32 Images, Part 1,
Att: 48 Exhibit 43 - Network 32 Images, Part 2,
Att: 49 Exhibit 44 - Network 33 Images, Part 1,
Att: 50 Exhibit 44 - Network 33 Images, Part 2,
Att: 51 Exhibit 45 - Network 34 Images, Part 1,
Att: 52 Exhibit 45 - Network 34 Images, Part 2,
Att: 53 Exhibit 46 - Network 35 Images,
Att: 54 Exhibit 47 - Network 36 Images,
Att: 55 Exhibit 48 - Network 37 Images,
Att: 56 Exhibit 49 - Network 38 Images,
Att: 57 Exhibit 50 - Network 39 Images, Part 1,
Att: 58 Exhibit 50 - Network 39 Images, Part 2,
Att: 59 Exhibit 51 - Network 40 Images,
Att: 60 Exhibit 52 - Network 41 Images,
Att: 61 Exhibit 53 - Network 42 Images,
Att: 62 Exhibit 54 - Network 43 Images,
Att: 63 Exhibit 55 - Network 44 Images, Part 1,
Att: 64 Exhibit 55 - Network 44 Images, Part 2,
Att: 65 Exhibit 56 - Network 45 Images,
Att: 66 Exhibit 57 - Network 46 Images,
Att: 67 Exhibit 58 - Network 47 Images,
Att: 68 Exhibit 59 - Network 48 Images,
Att: 69 16 pgs Exhibit 60 - Network 49 Images,
Att: 70 Exhibit 61 - Network 50 Images,
Att: 71 Exhibit 62 - Network 51 Images,
Att: 72 Exhibit 63 - Network 52 Images
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 12:24 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colleen O'Leary Devine on behalf of Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 12:21 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Sean Hogan on behalf of Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Hogan, Howard)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 06/13 2:48 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Mr. Wang, Rimisneaker.us, Shiby NY Inc., Songsneaker.com, Stockxshoes.com, Stockxshoesvip.com, Ypeunique.com, Rsneakers.fun;, $DedianFang, Xylar.co, SP Xylar Studio, Ebuysneakers.com, Bombline.la, Bombline.cc, M1sneakers.com, Coptop.net, Coptop.ru, Coptop, Jaskicks.ru, Perfectkicks.top, Luckshoes.ru, Sneakerwill.shop, Pkstockx.cc, Uabatman.com, Uabat.xyz, Cnfashionclub.com, Taosneakers.com, Dunksticks.org, Jordonkicks.org, Popkicks.org, Popshoe.org, Peinabaxnyj, Pkshoes.store, One Pick (HK) Limited, Vkomall, Clothswmalls.com, Jdfoot.co, Hypeboost.ru, Hypeboosts.com, Hypeboost.shop, Hypeboosts.ru, EKO DG Trading Inc, Hotkickss.ru, Gmkim.vn.ua, Yzynation.com, ln5factory.com, Kicksgate.com, Flightkickz.com, Flightkickz.cn, Wai Chan, Dopesneaker.co, Jiemao Commerce Co. Ltd, Crewkicks.org, Crewkick.net, Wtp*stepsupshoes, Coolkicksmall.com, $kaideninc616, Clubkickz.com added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc.. Related document:1 Complaint,,,..(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 06/13 3:18 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents $DedianFang, $kaideninc616, $ytrading616, Bagsmalles.com, Bombline.cc, Bombline.la, Bstsneaker.com, Bstsneakers.com, Buykicks.me, Carlsneaker.com, Wai Chan, Clothswmalls.com, Clubkickz.com, Cnfashionclub.com, Cocoshoesvip.com, Coolkicksmall.com, Coptop, Coptop.net, Coptop.ru, Crewkick.net, Crewkicks.org, Ddkicks.net, Dopesneaker.co, Dunksticks.org, EKO DG Trading Inc, Ebuysneakers.com, Flightkickz.cn, Flightkickz.com, Gdleyu Inc., Gmkim.vn.ua, Hotkicks.cc, Hotkicks.org, Hotkickss.ru, Hypeboost.ru, Hypeboost.shop, Hypeboosts.com, Hypeboosts.ru, Jaskicks.ru, Jdfoot.co, Jiemao Commerce Co. Ltd, Joom E-Commerce Company Limited, Jordonkicks.org, Kicksgate.com, Luckshoes.ru, M1sneakers.com, Ming Fu Hong Trading Limited, Mr. Wang, One Pick (HK) Limited, Peinabaxnyj, Perfectkicks.top, Pkshoes.store, Pkstockx.cc, Popkicks.org, Popshoe.org, Rimisneaker.us, Rsneakers.fun;, SP Xylar Studio, Shiby NY Inc., Sneakerwill.shop, Songsneaker.com, Stockxshoes.com, Stockxshoesvip.com, Taosneakers.com, Uabat.xyz, Uabatman.com, Vkomall, Wtpstepsupshoes, Xylar.co, Ypeunique.com, Yzynation.com, ln5factory.com, Footskick.ru, Star EFX Fashion Inc., Bmlin.net, Hypeshoes.co, Stockxkicks.com, Wawone.com, Ulrica688.x.yupoo.com, Ubuysneakers.com, Casnda Corp Limited-B2c, Timsneakers.com, Supersneakers.vip, Stockxprovip.com, Stockxpro.vip, Stockxpro.com, Sharesneakers.vip, Sharesneakers.us, Sharesneaker.vip, Sharesneaker.us, Stylesneaks.com, Pyn*Cnfashion Club, Hewitt2303.x.yupoo.com, Rarerepclothing.x.yupoo.com, Rarerapsneaker.x.yupoo.com, Sing Ying Trading Limited, Muksstore.x.yupoo.com, Houyw.x.yupoo.com, Bo Ying Trading Hong Kong Limited, Monicasneaker.cc, Mangomee.co, Mangomeee.com, Mika Technology Co. Limited, 888kicks.ru, Lkkiks.com, Xianguo Zhou, Xblo594.x.yupoo.com, Lgrose.ru, Guoxiong Lin, Kickzlucas.com, Kickwho.xyz, Kickwho.cc, Misstylea, Killone.x.yupoo.com, Kickscentral.cc, Kickcentral.me, Kickmax.ru, EFX Fashion Inc., Hypeunique.me, Hypeunique.is added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc.. Related document:1 Complaint,,,..(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Removal of Party Thu 06/13 9:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Robert L Weigel. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Ypeunique.com. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 06/13 9:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert L Weigel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ypeunique.com, Clubkickz.com. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 06/13 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert L Weigel re: Document No. 1 Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party ( dmsneaker.com; solenlaces.com; ABC Companies and John Does 1-100, CocoShoes.Net, Rimisneaker.CC, Rimisneaker.Ru to ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 06/13 9:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 06/13 9:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 06/13 9:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/13 9:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert L Weigel to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all the parties were not added to ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Thu 06/13 10:05 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 06/13 11:01 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents $DedianFang, $kaideninc616, $ytrading616, 888kicks.ru, Bagsmalles.com, Bmlin.net, Bo Ying Trading Hong Kong Limited, Bombline.cc, Bombline.la, Bstsneaker.com, Bstsneakers.com, Buykicks.me, Carlsneaker.com, Casnda Corp Limited-B2c, Wai Chan, Clothswmalls.com, Clubkickz.com, Cnfashionclub.com, Cocoshoesvip.com, Coolkicksmall.com, Coptop, Coptop.net, Coptop.ru, Crewkick.net, Crewkicks.org, Ddkicks.net, Dopesneaker.co, Dunksticks.org, EFX Fashion Inc., EKO DG Trading Inc, Ebuysneakers.com, Flightkickz.cn, Flightkickz.com, Footskick.ru, Gdleyu Inc., Gmkim.vn.ua, Hewitt2303.x.yupoo.com, Hotkicks.cc, Hotkicks.org, Hotkickss.ru, Houyw.x.yupoo.com, Hypeboost.ru, Hypeboost.shop, Hypeboosts.com, Hypeboosts.ru, Hypeshoes.co, Hypeunique.com, Hypeunique.is, Hypeunique.me, Jaskicks.ru, Jdfoot.co, Jiemao Commerce Co. Ltd, Joom E-Commerce Company Limited, Jordonkicks.org, Kickcentral.me, Kickmax.ru, Kickscentral.cc, Kicksgate.com, Kickwho.cc, Kickwho.xyz, Kickzlucas.com, Killone.x.yupoo.com, Lgrose.ru, Guoxiong Lin, Lkkiks.com, Luckshoes.ru, M1sneakers.com, Mangomee.co, Mangomeee.com, Mika Technology Co. Limited, Ming Fu Hong Trading Limited, Misstylea, Monicasneaker.cc, Mr. Wang, Muksstore.x.yupoo.com, One Pick (HK) Limited, Peinabaxnyj, Perfectkicks.top, Pkshoes.store, Pkstockx.cc, Popkicks.org, Popshoe.org, PynCnfashion Club, Rarerapsneaker.x.yupoo.com, Rarerepclothing.x.yupoo.com, Rimisneaker.us, Rsneakers.fun;, SP Xylar Studio, Sharesneaker.us, Sharesneaker.vip, Sharesneakers.us, Sharesneakers.vip, Shiby NY Inc., Sing Ying Trading Limited, Sneakerwill.shop, Songsneaker.com, Star EFX Fashion Inc., Stockxkicks.com, Stockxpro.com, Stockxpro.vip, Stockxprovip.com, Stockxshoes.com, Stockxshoesvip.com, Stylesneaks.com, Supersneakers.vip, Taosneakers.com, Timsneakers.com, Uabat.xyz, Uabatman.com, Ubuysneakers.com, Ulrica688.x.yupoo.com, Vkomall, Wawone.com, Wtpstepsupshoes, Xblo594.x.yupoo.com, Xylar.co, Yzynation.com, Xianguo Zhou, ln5factory.com, Dmsneaker.com, Solenlaces.com, CocoShoes.Net, Rimisneaker.CC, Rimisneaker.Ru, ABC Companies, John Does 1-100 added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc.. Related document:1 Complaint,,,..(Devine, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Wed 06/12 10:42 PM
DECLARATION of Robert L. Weigel in Support re:5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 March 16, 2006 Speech,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 April 23, 2021 Press Release,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 EO 13904,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 June 9, 2004 Speech,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 June 20, 2016 Article,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 2021 U.S. CBP Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 January 24, 2020 Report,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 February 2017 Report,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 August 11, 2022 Article,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Part 1 of 2 - Ideavillage Prods. Corp. v. OhMyGod1, Dkt. 22,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 Part 2 of 2 - Ideavillage,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Mattel, Inc. v. 2012Shiningroom2012, Dkt. 4,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Off-White LLC v. 6014350, Dkt. 19,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Part 1 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 3,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 - Part 2 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 3,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14 - Part 1 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 14,
Att: 17 Exhibit 14 - Part 2 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 14,
Att: 18 Exhibit 15 - Part 1 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 19,
Att: 19 Exhibit 15 - Part 2 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 19,
Att: 20 30 pgs Exhibit 16 - Part 1 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 24,
Att: 21 Exhibit 16 - Part 2 of 2 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 24,
Att: 22 Exhibit 17 - Nike v. Wu, Dkt. 27,
Att: 23 23 pgs Exhibit 18 - Nike, Inc. v. wwww.perfectkicks.me, Dkt. 17,
Att: 24 209 pgs Exhibit 19 - Nike, Inc. v. wwww.perfectkicks.me, Dkt. 29,
Att: 25 Exhibit 20 - Nike, Inc. v. wwww.perfectkicks.me, Dkt. 33,
Att: 26 Exhibit 21 - Nike, Inc. v. wwww.perfectkicks.me, Dkt. 40,
Att: 27 Exhibit 22 - Nike, Inc. v. wwww.perfectkicks.me, Dkt. 61
7 7 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Wed 06/12 9:48 PM
DECLARATION of Joe Pallett in Support re:5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Nike's Website,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Converse's Website
6 6 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Wed 06/12 9:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Wed 06/12 9:35 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc.. Related Document Number:1 ..(Weigel, Robert) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/12 9:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to See Rider A, re:1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/12 9:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nike, Inc. for Converse Inc.; Corporate Parent no corporate parent and no publicly held coporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock for Nike, Inc.. Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/12 9:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 141 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 8:12 PM
COMPLAINT against $ytrading616, Bagsmalles.com, Bstsneaker.com, Bstsneakers.com, Buykicks.me, Carlsneaker.com, Cocoshoesvip.com, Ddkicks.net, Gdleyu Inc., Hotkicks.cc, Hotkicks.org, Joom E-Commerce Company Limited, Ming Fu Hong Trading Limited, Mr. Wang, Rimisneaker.us, Shiby NY Inc., Songsneaker.com, Stockxshoes.com, Stockxshoesvip.com, Ypeunique.com. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29480660)Document filed by Converse Inc., Nike, Inc...(Weigel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit 1 - Defendant Networks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringing Websites by Network,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Known Email Addresses,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Infringing Social Media,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Known Names,
Att: 6 137 pgs Exhibit 6 - Network Damages By Category,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Infringing Websites by Domain Name