Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 2:24-cv-00132
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:45 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Casa Bariachi Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Lee Denison
Denison And Associates
contact info
Counter Claimant
Carlos Guzman Sotelo
Represented By
Christopher Lee Denison
Denison And Associates
contact info
Counter Defendant
Juana Magdaleno
Represented By
Mitchell Lloyd Feldman
Feldman Legal Group
contact info
Defendant
Casa Bariachi Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Lee Denison
Denison And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Guzman Sotelo
Represented By
Christopher Lee Denison
Denison And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Juana Magdaleno
Represented By
Mitchell Lloyd Feldman
Feldman Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 12/09 2:11 PM
ORDER granting the parties'23 Joint Motion to Review and Approve FLSA Settlement, and Dismiss with Prejudice the Claims by Plaintiff Juana Magdaleno. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/09/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 motion For Settlement Fri 12/06 4:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement COURT APPROVAL OF FLSA SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Juana Magdaleno, Casa Bariachi Inc.. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 12/03 9:48 AM
ORDER administratively terminating this action. If settlement is not finalized within sixty day of the entry of this Order, either Party may file a motion to reopen this civil action immediately at the conclusion of the sixty days. It is further ordered that the Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen this action, if necessary. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/03/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/03 9:49 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 11/18 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Juana Magdaleno (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 11/15 4:24 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file their Certificate(s) of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement within seven (7) calendar days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/15/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 11/04 2:15 PM
ORDER directing Defendants serve Plaintiff with responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production (both Defendants) and Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Defendant Casa Bariachi, Inc.) no later than 4:30 p.m. on November 5, 2024. Failure to comply will result in sanctions, which could include striking Defendants' Answer. Plaintiff's counsel is entitled to attorney fees related to this discovery dispute. Therefore, he shall file his fee petition reflecting the time expended in drafting and sending the position statement as well and preparing for and participating in the November 3, 2024 telephone conference. The fee petition shall be filed on the docket no later than November 17, 2024. Defendants shall have fourteen days to file a response regarding the reasonableness of the fees sought. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/04/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 11/04 12:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Telephone Conference held on 11/4/2024 held regarding discovery dispute upon request of Plaintiff. The Court heard from counsel. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Viola Zborowski)(ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 10/16 11:32 AM
Submission of16 MOTION to Strike15 Response in Opposition to Motion ,11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/14 12:31 PM
NOTICE by Juana Magdaleno OF MEDIATION (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
16 16 motion Strike Mon 09/09 2:53 PM
MOTION to Strike15 Response in Opposition to Motion with Brief In Support by Juana Magdaleno. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/09 7:27 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Casa Bariachi Inc., Casa Bariachi Inc., Carlos Guzman Sotelo, Carlos Guzman Sotelo. (Denison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/27 12:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties'13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to conclude on April 27, 2025. As this is twice the time anticipated by the Local Rules for discovery in litigation of this nature, NO FURTHER EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY WILL BE PERMITTED. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before May 27, 2025. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/27/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 08/22 1:16 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Juana Magdaleno. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/20 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Juana Magdaleno.(Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/16 5:50 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Juana Magdaleno, Juana Magdaleno.(Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 07/30 10:42 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 12/27/2024.), First COUNTERCLAIM against Juana Magdaleno with Jury Demand by Casa Bariachi Inc., Carlos Guzman Sotelo.(Denison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 07/30 2:37 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Correct Scrivener's Error in the Case Caption. The Clerk is DIRECTED to correct the spelling of Plaintiff's last name. The proper spelling is Magdaleno. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/30/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Tue 07/23 6:20 PM
Return of Service Executed by Juana Magdelano. Carlos Guzman Sotelo served on 7/9/2024, answer due 7/30/2024. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 07/17 10:20 AM
DOCKET ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/17/2024. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/16 10:19 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time re:1 Complaint, To Answer by Casa Bariachi Inc., Carlos Guzman Sotelo.(Denison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Defendant Sotelo
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 motion For Order Wed 07/10 1:54 PM
MOTION for Order TO CORRECT SCRIVENER'S ERROR IN CASE CAPTION by Juana Magdelano. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Fri 07/05 9:15 AM
Return of Service Executed by Juana Magdelano. Casa Bariachi Inc. served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Wed 07/03 5:03 PM
COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing Standing Order: Instructions for Cases Assigned to the Honorable Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 06/20 11:34 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:24-CV-132-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/20/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/12 8:35 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Casa Bariachi Inc., Carlos Guzman Sotelo.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 8:31 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Juana Magdelano. (Filing fee $405.00, receipt number AGANDC-13497790)(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet