New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-06959
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2024 4:58 AM EST
Defendant
COI LERAY
Plaintiff
PRINCE TRE'QUAN RIDDLE-ALI
PRISONER NO. 811130 BARAGA CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 13924 WADAGA ROAD
BARAGA, MI 49908


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/16 11:05 AM
LETTER ORDER dismissing complaint. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/15/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/16 11:06 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
5 5 misc Application to Proceed IFP Wed 08/14 1:59 PM
APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by TRE'QUAN RIDDLE-ALI.(wh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
4 4 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/02 3:50 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Plaintiff PRINCE RIDDLE-ALI. (The Clerk's Office will attempt to re-mail to Plaintiff said mailings at address listed as TRE'QUAN RIDDLE-ALI, PRISONER NO. 811130, BARAGA CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 13924 WADAGA ROAD, BARAGA, MI 49908-9204.) (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
3 3 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Wed 06/12 11:53 AM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (adc, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Wed 06/12 11:46 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 7 pgs service Complaint Received Wed 06/12 11:44 AM
Complaint Received.(adc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope