Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:24-cv-01410
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 1:19 AM MST
Defendant
Grand Canyon Education Incorporated
Represented By
Taylor Lin
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta, Ga
contact info
Andrew Liebler
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta, Ga
contact info
Shanique C Campbell
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta, Ga
contact info
Derin Bronson Dickerson
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta, Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanner Smith
Represented By
Eric Rothschild
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Li Yu
Dicello Levitt Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
Peter Carmen Soldato
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor
contact info
Christopher J Bryant
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Adam J Levitt
Dicello Levitt Gutzler Llc - Chicago
contact info
Joseph Frate
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor, Oh
contact info
Madeline Devine Wiseman
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Plaintiff
Qimin Wang
Represented By
Eric Rothschild
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Li Yu
Dicello Levitt Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
Peter Carmen Soldato
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor
contact info
Christopher J Bryant
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Adam J Levitt
Dicello Levitt Gutzler Llc - Chicago
contact info
Joseph Frate
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor, Oh
contact info
Madeline Devine Wiseman
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimele Carter
Represented By
Eric Rothschild
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Li Yu
Dicello Levitt Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
Peter Carmen Soldato
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor
contact info
Christopher J Bryant
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Adam J Levitt
Dicello Levitt Gutzler Llc - Chicago
contact info
Joseph Frate
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor, Oh
contact info
Madeline Devine Wiseman
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina Palmer
Represented By
Eric Rothschild
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Li Yu
Dicello Levitt Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
Peter Carmen Soldato
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor
contact info
Christopher J Bryant
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info
Adam J Levitt
Dicello Levitt Gutzler Llc - Chicago
contact info
Joseph Frate
Dicello Levitt Llp - Mentor, Oh
contact info
Madeline Devine Wiseman
National Student Legal Defense Network - Rhode Island Ave.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, May 16, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/16 8:59 AM
ORDER that the Joint Motion29 is granted. Defendant Grand Canyon Education Incorporated shall have until 6/20/2025, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/15/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/15 11:34 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:18 Amended Complaint, by Grand Canyon Education Incorporated.(Lin, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
28 28 18 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/06 8:16 AM
ORDER granting as to Count 1 and denying as to all other claims24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' may file a Second Amended Complaint as to amend their Count I no later than May 20, 2025. If Plaintiffs fail to file a Second Amended Complaint by that date, Plaintiffs' Count One will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/6/25. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/15 5:35 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Certificate of Conferral filed by Grand Canyon Education Incorporated. (Dickerson, Derin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/19 3:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Certificate of Conferral filed by Sabrina Palmer, Kimele Carter, Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. (Yu, Li)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 11/05 2:51 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is accepted as filed at Doc.24 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/5/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/04 10:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Certificate of Conferral by Grand Canyon Education Incorporated.(Dickerson, Derin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Tanner Smith Doctoral Program Calculator,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Qimin Wang Doctoral Program Calculator,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Tanner Smith Doctoral Disclaimers Acknowledgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Qimin Wang Doctoral Disclaimers Acknowledgment,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Sabrina Palmer Doctoral Dissertation Acknowledgment,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Kimele Carter Doctoral Disclaimers Acknowledgement,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Tanner Smith Enrollment Agreement,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Qimin Wang Enrollment Agreement,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Sabrina Palmer Enrollment Agreement,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Kimele Carter Enrollment Agreement,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 motion File Excess Pages Thu 10/31 10:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Grand Canyon Education Incorporated.(Dickerson, Derin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 26, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/26 5:12 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until November 4, 2024, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if a responsive motion is filed, Plaintiffs shall have until December 19, 2024, to file a response, and Defendant shall have until January 15, 2025, to file a reply. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/26/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 09/24 8:53 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Madeline Devine Wiseman on behalf of Plaintiffs Kimele Carter, Sabrina Palmer, Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/23 2:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Response to the First Amended Complaint and for Related Briefing (First Request) by Kimele Carter, Sabrina Palmer, Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang.(Yu, Li)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Mon 09/23 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Kimele Carter, Sabrina Palmer, Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang .(Yu, Li)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redline of Amended Complaint
19 19 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Mon 09/23 8:58 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:18 Amended Complaint filed by Kimele Carter, Qimin Wang, Sabrina Palmer, Tanner Smith. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/20 12:23 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grand Canyon Education Incorporated filed by Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang, Sabrina Palmer, Kimele Carter.(Levitt, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Redline Comparison of Original Complaint to Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 31, 2023 Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Nov. 6, 2019 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - June 12, 2024 Letter
Thursday, August 15, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/15 12:09 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall have until September 25, 2024, to file ananswer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/14/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/14 9:27 AM
*Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Grand Canyon Education Incorporated.(Dickerson, Derin) *Modified to correct motion type and text on 8/14/2024 (KLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 08, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 08/08 3:46 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Andrew Liebler on behalf of Defendant Grand Canyon Education Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 07/31 8:15 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shanique C Campbell on behalf of Defendant Grand Canyon Education Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 07/31 10:36 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Derin Bronson Dickerson on behalf of Defendant Grand Canyon Education Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 07/31 2:32 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Taylor Lin on behalf of Defendant Grand Canyon Education Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/12 2:09 PM
NOTICE re: Service of the Preliminary Order by Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang re:14 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Yu, Li)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 06/28 5:05 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 9/10/2024; 2. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and 3. That unless the Court orders otherwise, on 9/10/2024, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 6/28/2024. (RMW)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service Executed Fri 06/28 1:29 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/26/2024 to Derin Dickerson . (Soldato, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
12 12 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/27 8:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-1410 PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
11 11 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Thu 06/27 8:48 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 06/25 6:56 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eric Rothchild on behalf of Plaintiffs Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/24 1:40 PM
ORDER that the Motion for Extension7 is GRANTED. Eric Rothschild shall file his application to appear pro hac vice on or before June 28, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/24/2024. (KLG) *Modified to correct text on 6/24/2024 (KLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Fri 06/21 1:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Eric Rothschild to Submit His Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang.(Yu, Li)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 06/21 7:58 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Li Yu on behalf of Plaintiffs Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 06/21 10:24 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher J Bryant on behalf of Plaintiffs Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 06/20 11:59 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Peter Carmen Soldato on behalf of Plaintiffs Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 06/20 1:04 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph Frate on behalf of Plaintiffs Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
6 6 1 pgs misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 06/13 11:51 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. (Levitt, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Wed 06/12 5:45 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Qimin Wang, Tanner Smith. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 06/12 5:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Grand Canyon Education Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc New Case Opened Wed 06/12 5:41 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23112126. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01410 PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Submitted Wed 06/12 5:39 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. (submitted by Adam Levitt) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23142126 filed by Tanner Smith, Qimin Wang. (submitted by Adam Levitt)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 35 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 19 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet