California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00130
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 13, 2024 12:18 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Phillip Paredes (1)
Terminated: 06/11/2024


Docket last updated: 06/13/2024 1:00 AM PDT
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 PROPOSED ORDER: Probation Form 22 - Transfer of Jurisdiction as to Phillip Paredes. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 TRANSFER of JURISDICTION (PROBATION 22 In) signed on 6/11/2024 as to Phillip Paredes from District of Hawaii. DEFENDANT TERMINATED. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]