Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00256
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 13, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Douglas Stanley (1)
Represented By
George Michael DeGeurin, Jr
Foreman Degeurin Et Al.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 06/13/2024 3:07 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Douglas Stanley, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Douglas Stanley: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 6/11/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho (glk4)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho: INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Douglas Stanley held on 6/11/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed on the record. Court to appoint counsel from CJA Panel. Defendant appears with counsel. Brady order administered. Defendant WAIVES Identity hearing on the record. Defendant released on agreed bond. Conditions read into the record. Defendant to appear in Oxford for his next court proceedings. Appearances: AUSA: Barri Dean; CJA: Michael DeGeurin.(ERO: Yes) (Interpreter: No) Deft released on Bond, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
RULE 5 Papers sent via email to Oxford Division as to Douglas Stanley, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs Indictment from Northern District of Mississippi (Oxford Division) as to Douglas Stanley, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 5/23/2024; Returned Executed on 6/10/2024 as to Douglas Stanley. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR LIMITED PURPOSE for Defendant Douglas Stanley. Michael DeGeurin appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Douglas Stanley ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
5 5 10,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to Douglas Stanley, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Douglas Stanley. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted
7 7 1 pgs ORDER for Defendant to Appear in the District Where Charges Are Pending and Transferring Bail as to Douglas Stanley. The clerk is ordered to transfer any bail deposited in the registry of this court to the clerk of the court where the charges are pending. Charging District: Northern District of Mississippi, Oxford Division, 3:24-cr-53. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]