Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00036
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 13, 2024 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRISTIAN BAUMGARTH (1)
Represented By
ERIC C CRAWFORD
contact info
FEDERAL DEFENDERS MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA INC
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
WILLIAM KEYES
United States Attorneys Office
contact info

GPO Nov 27 2024
JUDGMENT as to CHRISTIAN BAUMGARTH (1), Count(s) 1-2, 4, Dismissed upon motion from the government; Count(s) 3, 72 months imprisonment, 25 years supervised release, $100 mandatory assessment fee, $5,000 assessment pursuant to Justice for Victims of Trafficking Act. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/27/2024. (elp)

Docket last updated: 06/13/2024 4:13 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
1 1 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to CHRISTIAN BAUMGARTH (1) count(s) 1- 4. (elp) Modified to remove text SEALED on 5/16/2024 (cma).
Related: [-]