Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas L Ludington
Referred: Patricia T Morris
Case #: 1:24-cv-11552
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Dow Credit Union
Represented By
Marc T. Bowen
Bowen, Radabaugh & Milton, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Chris Llamas
Represented By
Marc T. Bowen
Bowen, Radabaugh & Milton, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lalonde
Represented By
Kevin J. Kelly
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info
Victor Joseph Mastromarco, III
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 05/21 2:48 PM
ORDER Granting in Part Defendants'20 Unopposed Motion to Adjourn. ( Discovery due by 6/9/2025 , Settlement Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/9/2025 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington , Jury Trial set for 1/6/2026 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Monday, May 19, 2025
20 20 motion Extend - free Mon 05/19 8:17 PM
MOTION TO EXTEND Scheduling Order Dates by All Defendants. (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 11:32 AM
ORDER ADJOURNING SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/19/2025; Settlement Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/18/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2025 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 12/9/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 notice Withdraw Motion Fri 02/21 10:53 AM
NOTICE by Dow Credit Union of withdrawal of14 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Adjourn Dates . (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 02/21 8:58 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Adjourning All Case Management and Scheduling Order Dates. ( Discovery due by 5/19/2025 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/18/2025 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
Related: [-]
minutes Hearing Not Held/Hearing Cancelled Fri 02/21 11:31 AM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris: Motion Hearing Cancelled (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KCas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/11 2:32 PM
Reset Hearing as to14 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Adjourn Dates . Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 2/21/2025 , Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2025 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (KCas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 02/10 4:09 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on14 Motion to Compel. Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 3/4/2025 , Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge* Fri 02/07 4:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris:14 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Adjourn Dates filed by Dow Credit Union. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Compel Fri 02/07 4:25 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery and Adjourn Dates by Dow Credit Union. (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Discovery,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Emails
Thursday, January 23, 2025
13 13 notice Appear* Thu 01/23 3:51 PM
REMINDER NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 order Protective Order Wed 01/15 11:07 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/16 10:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/18/2025; Settlement Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/18/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 2:00 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 8/19/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Related [+] (KWin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
notice Error Fri 08/16 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Marc T. Bowen re10 Statement. Per9 Order to Submit Statement for Case Management Order, Short Statements are to be Submitted to CM/ECF; Utilities; Proposed Orders and Not Filed on the Docket. Please Submit to Proposed Orders Event.10 Statement is Stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KWin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 misc Statement - free Wed 08/14 6:31 PM
STATEMENT of Defendants' Short Statement by All Defendants (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/25 8:57 AM
ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. ( Short Statements Submitted to CM/ECF; Utilities; Proposed Orders by 8/14/2024. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/24 4:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 07/24 4:24 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc T. Bowen appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/10 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Plaintiffs. (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 07/01 3:02 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor Joseph Mastromarco, III appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 07/01 2:59 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Kelly appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued* Thu 06/13 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Dow Credit Union, Chris Llamas* (JPar)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error* Thu 06/13 2:55 PM
Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III* and *Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr.* in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 06/13 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9828311 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland - County Where Action Arose: Midland - County of 1st Defendant: Midland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 06/13 3:12 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JPar)
Related: [-]