New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:24-cv-04530
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Yext, Inc.
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Erika Freeman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Adam Gershenson
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chris Brownlee
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Erika Freeman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Adam Gershenson
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stuart Greer
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Erika Freeman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Adam Gershenson
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Keith Hadelman
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Erika Freeman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Adam Gershenson
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jenette Simisky
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Erika Freeman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Adam Gershenson
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Megan Menesale
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Erika Freeman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Adam Gershenson
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SOCi, Inc.
Represented By
L. Reid Skibell
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes LLP
contact info
Evan McCants-Goldman
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes
contact info
Lyn Agre
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes
contact info
Edward E Shapiro
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes LLP
contact info
Jason Rotstein
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
147 147 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/15 1:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Wednesday, June 18, 2025 at 3:30 p.m. with Plaintiff's counsel only. Please call Chambers at 2128050260 when all counsel are on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/15/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
146 146 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/15 1:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Preliminary Settlement Conference Call on Wednesday, June 18, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. with Defense counsel only. Please call Chambers at 2128050260 when all counsel are on the line. Telephone Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/15/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]