Hofmann v. 149 Clinton Street Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kevin R Anderson |
Case #: | 2:24-ap-02062 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
149 Clinton Street Corporation
11387 E Teach Rd.
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT |
Saturday, March 22, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Service Re: Order. Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Granting Default Judgment Against Defendant. , Judgment Entered in Favor of Trustee Against Defendant in the Amount of $17040.23 (mkh) |
|
court
Dispose Adversary Case
Thu 03/20 1:46 PM
Adversary Case 24-02062 Disposed. (mkh) |
||
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Pending Order Re:7 Motion for Default Judgment. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Hearing Filed by 149 Clinton Street Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 3/7/2025. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Motion for Default Judgment Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Default Certificate. (jtt) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion for Entry of Judgment/Order Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Affidavit/Declaration Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Pending Default Certificate Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Service Executed. Party Served: 149 Clinton Street Corporation and Anne Mertens, Registered Agent of 149 Clinton Street Corporation. (Houlin, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
misc
Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE)
Tue 08/27 2:21 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02062 . Complaint by George Hofmann against 149 Clinton Street Corporation. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 ]. (Houlin, Andrew) |