Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02064
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
DN8TT, Inc.
14021 E Ayesbury Circle
Wichita, KS 67228
Represented By
DN8TT, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Saturday, March 22, 2025
12 12 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sat 03/22 10:43 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Default Judgment
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 order Default Judgment (order) Thu 03/20 1:50 PM
Order Granting Default Judgment Against Defendant. Related [+], Judgment Entered in Favor of Trustee Against Defendant in the Amount of $11,102.08. (mkh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Dispose Adversary Case Thu 03/20 1:53 PM
Adversary Case 24-02064 Disposed. (mkh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 misc Pending Order Tue 03/11 4:41 PM
Pending Order Re:7 Motion for Default Judgment. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 9:17 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment,8 Notice of Hearing
8 8 notice *Notice of Hearing Tue 02/18 9:16 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 3/7/2025. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment
7 7 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Tue 02/18 9:15 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
6 6 court Default Certificate Fri 11/08 3:04 PM
Default Certificate. (jtt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 motion Application for Entry of Order/Judgment Re: (Motion) Tue 11/05 3:48 PM
Application for Entry of Order/Judgment Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Pending Default Certificate
4 4 misc Affidavit/Declaration Tue 11/05 3:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] of Service Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, Summons Issued (auto),2 Summons Service Executed
3 3 notice Pending Default Certificate Tue 11/05 3:46 PM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/08 9:44 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: DN8TT, Inc. and Thuy Thi Mai, Registered Agent for DN8TT, Inc. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:23 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 2:34 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02064 . Complaint by George Hofmann against DN8TT, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference