Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02066
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
EDENS, Inc.
1272 5th Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Represented By
EDENS, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Remark Mon 02/10 8:38 AM
Remark. Order Approving Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #329. (tdg)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 02/10 8:42 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2066 Disposed. (tdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
utility Remark Tue 01/21 10:09 AM
Remark. Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #309 (tdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 answer Response Mon 01/06 1:50 PM
Response to Related [+] to Order to Show Cause Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution
Thursday, December 19, 2024
4 4 generic Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Thu 12/19 10:26 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
3 3 order Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order) Tue 12/17 3:06 PM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 1/6/2025. (jst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/10 2:18 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: EDENS, Inc. and Jodie W. McLean, President of EDENS, Inc. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:24 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 2:54 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02066 . Complaint by George Hofmann against EDENS, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference