Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Franklin Fixtures LLC
621 Maxwell Street
Cokeville, TN 38501
Represented By
Franklin Fixtures LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
utility Remark Wed 04/16 1:19 PM
Remark. Order Approving Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #336. (tdg)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 04/16 2:04 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2068 Disposed. (tdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/17 3:02 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Notice of Hearing
10 10 notice *Notice of Hearing(Amended/Rescheduled) Mon 03/17 3:01 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] (Hearing Continued) Filed by George Hofmann. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 10:30 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 3/7/2025. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
utility Remark Wed 03/12 8:53 AM
Remark. Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #332. (tdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 9:21 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment,8 Notice of Hearing
8 8 notice *Notice of Hearing Tue 02/18 9:20 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 3/7/2025. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment
7 7 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Tue 02/18 9:19 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
6 6 court Default Certificate Fri 11/08 3:06 PM
Default Certificate. (jtt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 motion Application for Entry of Order/Judgment Re: (Motion) Tue 11/05 3:43 PM
Application for Entry of Order/Judgment Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Pending Default Certificate
4 4 misc Affidavit/Declaration Tue 11/05 3:42 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] of Service Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, Summons Issued (auto),2 Summons Service Executed
3 3 notice Pending Default Certificate Tue 11/05 3:40 PM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/08 9:40 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Franklin Fixtures, LLC and Lisa C. Uhrik, Registered Agent of Franklin Fixtures, LLC. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:27 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 3:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02068 . Complaint by George Hofmann against Franklin Fixtures LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference