Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kimoa International LLC
2980 McFarlane Rd.
Miami, FL 33133
Represented By
Kimoa International LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Saturday, May 10, 2025
15 15 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sat 05/10 10:20 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 order Default Judgment (order) Thu 05/08 2:54 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (sjl)
Related: [-] 9
court Dispose Adversary Case Thu 05/08 2:56 PM
Adversary Case 24-02069 Disposed. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
13 13 misc Pending Order Wed 05/07 7:44 AM
Pending Order Re:9 Motion for Default Judgment. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order Unsigned Order (order) Tue 05/06 3:09 PM
Unsigned Order Related [+]. Reason Order Was Unsigned: Paragraph 6 indicates that the summons was served on August 27, 2024. However, the certificate of service at docket #6 indicates that service was on August 28, 2024. Please revise and resubmit (tdg)
Related: [-] 12 Pending Order filed by Andrew Houlin
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 misc Pending Order Tue 04/29 9:52 AM
Pending Order Re:9 Motion for Default Judgment. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/08 4:17 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment,10 Notice of Hearing
10 10 notice *Notice of Hearing Tue 04/08 4:16 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 10:30 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 4/25/2025. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment
9 9 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Tue 04/08 4:15 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 court Default Certificate Mon 03/31 12:17 PM
Default Certificate. (jtt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 misc Request Thu 03/27 1:38 PM
Request for Entry of Default Certificate Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit/Declaration Thu 03/27 1:37 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, Summons Issued (auto)
5 5 notice Pending Default Certificate Thu 03/27 1:35 PM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 answer Response Thu 03/20 2:21 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 2 Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 generic Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Thu 03/13 10:22 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Notice Date 03/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 order Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order) Tue 03/11 10:12 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 3/31/2025. (jst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:28 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 3:20 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02069 . Complaint by George Hofmann against Kimoa International LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference