Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02070
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
L&L Retail Construction LLC
5601 Huettner Drive
Norman, OK 73069
Represented By
L&L Retail Construction LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
utility Remark Mon 01/27 3:31 PM
Remark. Order Approving Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #324. (tdg)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 01/27 4:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2070 Disposed. (tdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
utility Remark Thu 01/02 3:35 PM
Remark. Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case # 22-22239 See docket # 305. (tdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/08 9:34 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: L&L Retail Construction, LLC and Gary Derrick, Registered Agent of L&L Retail Construction LLC. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:30 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 3:25 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02070 . Complaint by George Hofmann against L&L Retail Construction LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference