Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
M.E.P.N.J. Limited Partnership
1710 Dick Pond Road
Myrtle Beach, SC 29575
Represented By
M.E.P.N.J. Limited Partnership
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 08/27 2:18 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Tue 08/27 2:37 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2071 Disposed. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
utility Remark Mon 07/08 3:17 PM
Remark, Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case # 22-22239 See docket entry # 266.(gci)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 3:32 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02071 . Complaint by George Hofmann against M.E.P.N.J. Limited Partnership. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference