Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02072
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Prologis, Inc.
8355 NW 12th Street
Doral, FL 33126
Represented By
Prologis, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Monday, October 21, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 10/21 8:49 AM
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by George Hofmann. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 10/21 10:11 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2072 Disposed. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
6 6 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Fri 09/20 10:25 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 09/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
5 5 order Extend Time (order) Wed 09/18 12:58 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Response to Adversary Complaint to 10/18/24. Related [+] (mkh)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 misc Pending Order Wed 09/18 8:52 AM
Pending Order Re:3 Motion Extend Time. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extend Time (Motion) Wed 09/18 8:50 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Reply to Adversary Complaint Filed by George Hofmann. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/17 9:28 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Prologis, Inc. and Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for Prologis, Inc. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:31 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 3:39 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02072 . Complaint by George Hofmann against Prologis, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference