Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02074
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ryan Tax Compliance Services
PO Box 848351
Dallas, TX 75284
Represented By
Ryan Tax Compliance Services
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 11/14 10:11 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Thu 11/14 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2074 Disposed. (gci)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/08 9:26 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Ryan Tax Compliance Services and G. Brint Ryan, CEO of Ryan Tax Compliance Services. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
5 5 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Fri 10/04 6:15 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
4 4 order Extend Time (order) Tue 10/01 7:51 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Reply to Adversary Complaint Related [+] (sjl)
Related: [-] 2
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 misc Pending Order Fri 09/20 2:11 PM
Pending Order Re:2 Motion Extend Time. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Extend Time (Motion) Fri 09/20 2:11 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Reply to Adversary Complaint Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:33 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 3:56 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02074 . Complaint by George Hofmann against Ryan Tax Compliance Services. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference