Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02076
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Texas Comptroller
PO Box 13528 Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Texas Comptroller
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 12/18 1:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 12/18 1:39 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2076 Disposed. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
9 9 order Appear Pro Hac Vice (order) Thu 10/17 4:28 PM
Order Granting Motion for Attorney Jamie Kirk for Texas Comptroller To Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+] (sjl)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Fri 10/04 6:15 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
7 7 order Extend Time (order) Tue 10/01 7:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Reply to Adversary Complaint Related [+] (sjl)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, September 30, 2024
crditcrd PayGov Receipt of Fee Due Mon 09/30 8:49 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 24-02076 ) [motion,mprohac] ( 50.00). Receipt Number A27653659, Amount $ 50.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#5
Thursday, September 26, 2024
6 6 misc Pending Order Thu 09/26 6:06 PM
Pending Order Re:5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. (Waite, Aaron)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (FEE) (Motion) Thu 09/26 6:05 PM
Motion Requesting Admission of Attorney Jamie Kirk to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Fee Amount: $50. Filed by Texas Comptroller. (Waite, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Wed 09/25 8:30 AM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Texas Comptroller. (Waite, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 misc Pending Order Fri 09/20 2:14 PM
Pending Order Re:3 Motion Extend Time. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extend Time (Motion) Fri 09/20 2:13 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Reply to Adversary Complaint Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 09/16 4:14 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Texas Comptroller and Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:35 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/12 4:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02076 . Complaint by George Hofmann against Texas Comptroller. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference