Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02079
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
CNA Financial Corporation
333 South Wabash Avenue, 29S
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
CNA Financial Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 08/27 2:20 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Tue 08/27 2:50 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2079 Disposed. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
utility Remark Wed 07/10 2:51 PM
Remark, Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case # 21-22239 See docket entry # 270. (gci)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/13 10:45 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02079 . Complaint by George Hofmann against CNA Financial Corporation. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference