Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22239

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02081
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Line Financial Corp.
921 West New Hope Drive
Cedar Park, TX 78613
Represented By
Line Financial Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hofmann, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Simply Mac, Inc.
Cohne Kinghorn, PC 111 E. Broadway 11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Andrew Houlin
Cohne Kinghorn, PC
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
utility Remark Mon 01/27 12:02 PM
Remark. Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #302. (tdg)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 01/27 3:35 PM
Remark. Order Approving Settlement Filed in Case 22-22239 See docket entry #325. (tdg)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 01/27 3:37 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2081 Disposed. (tdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 generic Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Fri 01/10 10:41 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
4 4 answer Response Wed 01/08 8:09 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
3 3 order Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order) Tue 01/07 1:46 PM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 1/27/2025. (jst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/08 9:37 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Garrington Financial Corp f/k/a Line Financial Corp and Corporation Service Company dba CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company, Registered Agent of Garrington Financial Corp f/k/a Line Financial Corp. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/27 2:38 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by George Hofmann. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/13 10:57 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02081 . Complaint by George Hofmann against Line Financial Corp. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Houlin, Andrew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference