California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-05013
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Terminated:Sep 10, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV14661
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 12:40 AM PST
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By
Christopher R. Fredrich
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Alice Kwak
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Julia Strickland
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Christopher R Fredrich
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Tauler Smith LLP
Represented By
Robert Tauler
Tauler Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
25 25 order Dismiss Case Tue 09/10 12:10 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal24 , and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and 2. In light of Plaintiff's dismissal, Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Associations Motion to Dismiss22 , is DISMISSED AS MOOT; and 3. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
24 24 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 09/09 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tauler Smith LLP. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Tauler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
23 23 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 08/26 5:14 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 22 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
22 22 motion Dismiss Case Mon 08/26 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 05, 2024
21 21 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 08/05 3:23 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 14 DAYS TO AUGUST 26, 202420 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
20 20 4 pgs stip Order Fri 08/02 2:43 PM
STIPULATION for Order TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 14 DAYS filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 order Dismiss Case Fri 08/02 1:23 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT15 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On July 8, 2024, Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Tauler Smith LLP's Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 9(b). Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint18 . Rule 15(a)(1) allows plaintiffs to file an amended complaint once as a matter of course within twenty-one days of service with a Rule 12(b) motion. Therefore, Plaintiff's amended complaint was proper. As the pending motion to dismiss was based on a complaint that is no longer operative, the motion is DENIED as MOOT. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 07/29 4:15 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Tauler Smith LLP(Tauler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/24 2:24 PM
Notice of Intent to Amend filed by Plaintiff Tauler Smith LLP. (Tauler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
16 16 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 07/08 4:35 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 15 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Mon 07/08 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 06/27 12:35 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association answer now due 7/8/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
13 13 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/26 12:28 PM
The Court has reviewed the Response to the Courts Order to Show Cause. (ECF No. 12.) The Order to Show Cause, (ECF No. 11), is hereby DISCHARGEDTHERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
12 12 misc Response Tue 06/25 12:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Associationto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,11 (Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 06/24 11:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than June 28, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiffs request for entry of default as to the Defendant. Answer by Defendant. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
10 10 order Writ Fri 06/21 2:10 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION AND RELATED RELIEF8 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
9 9 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 06/20 3:15 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Writ of of Possession and Related Relief 8 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher R. Fredrich
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 motion Writ Tue 06/18 3:40 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Writ of of Possession and Related Relief filed by Plaintiff Tauler Smith LLP. (Tauler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert Tauler in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 06/14 3:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 06/13 5:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 06/13 5:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 06/13 5:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 06/13 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, identifying Parent Corporation JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 06/13 3:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 06/13 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24STCV14661 Receipt No: ACACDC-37654590 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attorney Christopher R Fredrich added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association(pty:dft))(Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 06/13 6:05 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Tauler Smith LLP. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/12/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et)
Related: [-]