Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-06282
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 12:48 AM MST
Defendant
Oscar Sanchez-Perez (1)
Represented By
Elena M Kay
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 2:55 AM MST
Sunday, June 09, 2024
Arrest of Oscar Sanchez-Perez on 6/9/2024. (LML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Oscar Sanchez-Perez. (LML)
Related: [-]