Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:24-cr-00267
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 3:42 AM EDT
Defendant
David Blanco (1)
Represented By
Stephen Consuegra
Federal Defender Middle District Of Florida
contact info
Kathleen M. Sweeney
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Emmett Jackson Boggs, Jr
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 4:58 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to David Blanco (1). (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
Arrest of David Blanco on 5/13/2024. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Interpreter by David Blanco. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Blanco. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Blanco. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Kathleen M. Sweeney, AFD appointed as to David Blanco (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/14/2024. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to David Blanco: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to David Blanco. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORAL MOTION for Release from Custody by David Blanco. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: ORAL ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appoint Interpreter as to David Blanco (1); denying 10 Motion for Detention as to David Blanco (1); granting 11 Motion for Release from Custody as to David Blanco (1); BOND HEARING as to David Blanco held on 5/14/2024; DETENTION HEARING as to David Blanco held on 5/14/2024; Initial Appearance as to David Blanco held on 5/14/2024. (DIGITAL) (Interpreter/Language: James Plunkett/Spanish) (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
13 13 APPEARANCE BOND entered as to David Blanco in amount of $25000.00. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to David Blanco (1) Appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/14/2024. (EJC) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen Consuegra appearing for David Blanco and Substitution of Counsel (Consuegra, Stephen) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/13/2024 as to David Blanco. (AMS) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 Unopposed MOTION to Travel and to Modify Travel Restrictions for Work by David Blanco. (Consuegra, Stephen) [8:24-mj-01685-CPT]
Related: [-]
18 18 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to David Blanco (1) count(s) 1-2. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment