Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00214
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Timothy Ady (1)
Represented By
Samuel G. Amendolara
Law Office Of Samuel G. Amendolara
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Yasmine T. Makridis
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Youngstown
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 4:17 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
Arrest of Timothy Ady (1) on 5/21/2024. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Timothy Ady (1). (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] as to Timothy Ady (1). Initial Appearance set for 5/21/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 242 before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Samuel G. Amendolara for Timothy Ady. Counsel must report to the Court any significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/21/2024. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Initial Appearance as to Timothy Ady (1) held on 5/21/2024. AUSA Yasmine Makridis present on behalf of the government. Attorney Sam Amendolara present and appointed on behalf of the defendant. Government moved for detention. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 5/23/2024 01:00 PM in Courtroom 242 before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Defendant remanded to the custody of U.S. Marshal Service pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter ECRO - C. Eckert; Pretrial Officer Nicholas Ayers) Time: 5 minutes. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/21/2024 filed by USA as to Timothy Ady (1). (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Timothy Ady (1). Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/21/2024. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Notice and Order re Brady v. Maryland as to Timothy Ady (1). Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/21/2024. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Detention Pending Hearing as to Timothy Ady (1). Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/21/2024. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/21/2024 in case as to Defendant Timothy Ady (1). (D,Ju) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Detention Hearing as to Timothy Ady (1) held on 5/23/2024. AUSA Yasmine Makridis present on behalf of the government. Attorney Sam Amendolara present on behalf of defendant. Defendant waived preliminary hearing. Waiver executed. Case bound over to the Grand Jury for further proceedings. Proffers and arguments for and against detention made by the parties. The government's motion for detention granted. Defendant was ordered detained. Order of Detention to follow. (Court Reporter ECRO - T. Day; Supervising Officer Don Stranathan) Time: 20 minutes. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Timothy Ady (1). (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs Order of Detention as to Timothy Ady (1). Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/23/2024. (S,KL) [4:24-mj-06148-CEH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (L,Br)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs Indictment filed by USA as to Timothy Ady (1) count(s) 1. (L,Br)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page