Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00259
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez (1)
Represented By
Houston Interpreter
contact info
Julie Soderlund
Soderlund Law
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano (2)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 3:22 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 6/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho (glk4)
Related: [-]
Arrest (Rule 40) of Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 6/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho (glk4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 6/12/2024 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez. Defendant first appearance on Indictment from the Florida Southern District Court 1:24-cr-20238 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial Affidavit executed on the record, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing private counsel will be entered, Bond set, 20,000 Unsecured Appearance bond. Conditions read into the record., Defendant advised of conditions of release, Defendant to be released after bond perfected, Waiver of Identity executed on the record, Defendant on bond to appear in originating district Florida Southern District Court, Miami Division for hearing set on at,,,. Appearances: AUSA Barri Tanika Dean for USA; Julie Soderlund (CJA) for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: Yes) Bond executed and deft to be released, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez. Language: SPANISH. Houston Interpreter for Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez added. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 6/12/2024 before Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. Defendant first appearance on Indictment from the Florida Southern District Court 1:24-cr-20238 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial Affidavit executed on the record, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Bond set, 20,000 Unsecured Appearance bond. Conditions read into the record., Defendant advised of conditions of release, Defendant to be released after bond perfected, Waiver of Identity executed on the record, Defendant on bond to appear in originating district Florida Southern District Court, Miami Division for hearing set on at,,,. Appearances: AUSA Barri Tanika Dean for USA; AFPD Amr Ahmed for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: Yes) Bond executed and deft to be released, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. Language: SPANISH. Houston Interpreter for Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez added. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Indictment from Southern District of Florida, Miami Division as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 6/6/2024; Returned Executed on 6/12/2024 as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
3 3 31 pgs Indictment from Southern District of Florida, Miami Division as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant issued 6/6/2024; Returned Executed on 6/12/2024 as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. Defendant was arrested in Katy, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez. Julie Soderlund appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER for Defendant to Appear in the District Where Charges Are Pending and Transferring Bail as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez. The clerk is ordered to transfer any bail deposited in the registry of this court to the clerk of the court where the charges are pending. Charging District: Florida Southern District Court, Miami Division, 1:24-cr-20238. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER for Defendant to Appear in the District Where Charges Are Pending and Transferring Bail as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. The clerk is ordered to transfer any bail deposited in the registry of this court to the clerk of the court where the charges are pending. Charging District: Florida Southern District Court, Miami Division, 1:24-cr-20238. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
11 11 20,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Maria De Los Angeles Abreu Perez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted
13 13 20,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano, filed. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jonathan Jose Martinez Lambrano. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (rlw4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted