California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00975
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 1:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Mizraim Vega-Figueroa (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Roxana Sandoval
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Pedro Martinez-Marcelino
Represented By
Stacey A Kartchner
Law Office Of Stacey A Kartchner
contact info
Material Witness
Jesus Sandoval-Garcia
Represented By
Stacey A Kartchner
Law Office Of Stacey A Kartchner
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Parker Gardner-Erickson
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Jul 31 2024
JUDGMENT as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa (1). Count 1: Custody of the BOP for a term of time served. Supervised release for a term of three years. $100.00 special assessment waived. Fine waived. $5,000.00 JVTA assessment waived. Count 2: Government oral motion to dismiss is granted. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on July 31, 2024. (ekb)

Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 3:28 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Arrest of Mizraim Vega-Figueroa (no document attached) (vyc) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 4/18/2024 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 5/16/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr..(vyc) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Attorney Stacey A Kartchner for Jesus Sandoval-Garcia,Stacey A Kartchner for Pedro Martinez-Marcelino added. (no document attached) (vyc) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa held on 4/18/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. Detention Hearing - RF set for 4/22/2024 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 5/16/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(CD# 4/18/2024 LR2024 1:14-1:20). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/18/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa: Arraignment of MW set for 4/19/2024 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. (no document attached) (vyc) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Parker Gardner-Erickson appearing for USA. (Gardner-Erickson, Parker)Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson added to party USA(pty:pla) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Roxana Sandoval appearing for Mizraim Vega-Figueroa (Sandoval, Roxana)Attorney Roxana Sandoval added to party Mizraim Vega-Figueroa(pty:dft)(axc1). [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Jesus Sandoval-Garcia. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/19/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Pedro Martinez-Marcelino. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/19/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment of Material Witness Jesus Sandoval-Garcia, Pedro Martinez-Marcelino held on 4/19/2024. Material Witness bail set at $5,000 P/S w/10 percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 4/19/2024 LR2024 10:12-10:16). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. Report prepared by: C. Noriega Pretrial Officer. (Noriega, C.) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr:granting 7 Motion to Detain as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa (1); Detention Hearing as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa held on 4/22/2024. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA by COB on 4/23/2024. (CD# 4/22/2024 LR 24 1:33-1:42). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez S/A). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson S/A). (no document attached) (vyc) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER OF DETENTION as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/29/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 5/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (CD# 5/2/2024 LR 24: 10:19-10:21). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell, FD). (aum) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Gardner-Erickson, Parker) (axi). [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Stip of Fact and Joint Motion for Release of Material Witness(es) by USA (LR) (Gardner-Erickson, Parker) (axi). [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Mizraim Vega-Figueroa. Material Witness Hearing set for 5/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (no document attached) (aum) [2:24-mj-08320-LR]
Related: [-]