New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:24-bk-22537
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Dawkins Development Group Inc.
56 Lafayette Avenue, Ste 365
White Plains, NY 10603
Represented By
Jessica M Hill
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Julie Cvek Curley
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 11:26 AM EST
Attorney
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
700 Post Road Suite 237
Scarsdale, NY 10583
Represented By
Julie Cvek Curley
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Creditor
Marquis Associates, LLC
56 Lafayette Ave Suite 380
White Plains, NY 10603
Represented By
Steven A. Campanaro
contact info
Trustee
Samuel Dawidowicz
215 East 68th Street Ste 20m
New York, NY 10065
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Greg M. Zipes
Doj-Ust
contact info
Unknown
New York State Department of Labor, Division of Labor Standards
Building 12, State Campus
Albany, NY 12240
Represented By
Seth Kupferberg
Office Of The Attorney General, State Of Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
48 48 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 04/28 2:52 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on all matters currently scheduled for April 29, 2025 have been ADJOURNED to July 10, 2025 at 10:00 am filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 1:12 PM
Status Report and Request for Adjournment of April 29, 2025 Hearings Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
46 46 2 pgs order Order RE: Application, Final Professional Compensation Mon 03/24 3:12 PM
Order signed on 3/24/2025 Granting Application for Final Professional Compensationfor Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP, fees awarded: $28,885.00, expense awarded: $3,435.99 Related [+], Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation for Samuel Dawidowicz, fees awarded: $6,037.50, expense awarded: $0.00. (Tavarez, Arturo)
Related: [-] 35 37
Thursday, March 13, 2025
45 45 notice Notice, Hearing Thu 03/13 10:12 AM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Continued Case Management Conference will be held on April 29, 2025 at 10:00 am filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
44 44 misc Operating Report Fri 03/07 3:29 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 1-31, 2025 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
43 43 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 03/06 1:47 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Confirmation of the Debtor's First Amended Subchapter V Plan ONLY has been adjourned from March 11, 2025 to April 29, 2025, at 10:00 am filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Status Report Thu 03/06 11:59 AM
Status Report Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
41 41 misc Operating Report Thu 02/27 9:35 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 1 - 31, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
40 40 misc Operating Report Thu 02/20 6:09 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 1 - 30, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
39 39 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 01/22 4:43 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on (1) Case Status Conference, (2) Confirmation of First Amended Subchapter V Plan, (3) Final Fee Application of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP, and (4) Final Fee Application of Samuel Dawidowicz, Subchapter V Trustee from January 23, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. to March 11, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 37 ,35
Monday, December 23, 2024
38 38 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/23 3:27 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Hearing to Consider Final Fee Applications for Allowance of Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses; and Final Application for Allowance of Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP together with exhibits thereto Related [+] Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 36 ,35
37 37 3 pgs motion Application, Final Professional Compensation Mon 12/23 3:24 PM
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Samuel Dawidowicz, Trustee Chapter 11, period: 6/14/2024 to 12/20/2024, fee:$6037.50, expenses: $0. filed by Samuel Dawidowicz with hearing to be held on 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL). (Dawidowicz, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
36 36 notice Notice, Hearing Mon 12/23 10:56 AM
Notice of Hearing to Consider Final Fee Applications for Allowance of Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP. with hearing to be held on 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 35
35 35 15 pgs motion Application, Final Professional Compensation Mon 12/23 10:52 AM
Application for Final Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/14/2024 to 11/30/2024, fee:$28,885.00, expenses: $3,435.99. filed by Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP with hearing to be held on 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL). (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Certification
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" Coversheet together with Exhibits
Friday, December 06, 2024
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/06 1:48 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Fixing Deadlines Related to Debtor's First Amended Subchapter V Plan and Scheduling Confirmation Hearing together with Debtor's First Amended Subchapter V Chapter 11 Plan and exhibits thereto Related [+] Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 32 ,33
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
33 33 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/03 2:24 PM
Order Signed On 12/3/2024, Fixing Deadlines Related To Debtor's First Amended Subchapter V Plan And Scheduling Confirmation Hearing; With Confirmation Hearing To Be Held On 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
32 32 plan Amended/Modified Plan Mon 12/02 4:18 PM
First Amended Plan /First Amended Subchapter V Plan dated November 27, 2024 Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Objections due by 1/9/2025,(Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 24
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Jessup Stipulation
Monday, November 18, 2024
31 31 misc Operating Report Mon 11/18 5:19 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 1 - 31, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
30 30 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 11/14 8:26 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Seth Kupferberg on behalf of New York State Department of Labor, Division of Labor Standards. (Kupferberg, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
29 29 misc Operating Report Mon 11/04 12:54 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 1 - 30, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
28 28 misc Operating Report Wed 10/23 9:58 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 1 - 30, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
27 27 misc Operating Report Thu 10/17 10:52 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 1 - 31, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
26 26 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 09/25 8:22 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven A. Campanaro on behalf of Marquis Associates, LLC. (Campanaro, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
25 25 misc Operating Report Thu 09/19 11:38 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 14-30, 2024 Filed by Jessica M Hill on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Hill, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
24 24 18 pgs plan Chapter 11 Small Business Plan Thu 09/12 8:22 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/10 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Authorizing Debtors Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 and Providing Adequate Protection Therefore Pursuant to Sections 361and 362 Related [+] Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, September 09, 2024
22 22 order Motion, Approve Use of Cash Collateral Mon 09/09 10:28 PM
Order Signed On 9/9/2024, Authorizing Debtor's Use Of Cash Collateral And Providing Adequate Protection Therefor Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 08/21 9:08 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated; Filed missing schedules. (Tavarez, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/19 2:38 PM
Certificate of Service Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner and Notice Thereof together with Notice and Proof of Claim Form Related [+] Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 20
Thursday, August 15, 2024
20 20 order Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Thu 08/15 3:24 PM
Order Signed On 08/15/2024 Granting Re: Debtor's Motion Establishing Deadline For Filing Proofs Of Claim And Approving The Form And Manner Of Notice Thereof; Setting The Last Day To File Proofs Of Claim Due By: 09/27/2024, Related [+]. (Mercado, Tracey)
Related: [-] .#11
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Wed 08/14 10:09 AM
Order Signed On 08/14/2024 Granting Re: Debtor's Application Authorizing And Approving Retention Of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP As Attorneys For The Debtor Effective As Of June 14, 2024, Related [+]. (Mercado, Tracey)
Related: [-] .#13
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
18 18 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 07/30 11:45 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
17 17 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 07/24 11:47 AM
Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Motion (I) Requesting Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(c)(2) and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (II) Providing Adequate Protection Therefore Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§361 and 362; together with Underlying Motion and related exhibits thereto Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL)(Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 07/17 4:27 PM
Status Report Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §1188(c) Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/17 4:14 PM
Certificate of Service of Bar Date Motion and Application to Employ Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor Related [+] Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 13 ,11
14 14 motion Motion, Approve Use of Cash Collateral Wed 07/17 4:00 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(c)(2) and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and Providing Adequate Protection Therefor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§361 and 362 filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - SBA Loan Documents
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC Financing Statement
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Budget
13 13 2 pgs motion Application, Employ Wed 07/17 3:02 PM
Application to Employ Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc. with presentment to be held on 8/5/2024 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL). (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit A - Julie Cvek Curley's Declaration in Support of Application
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Lar Dan Declaration
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 07/17 2:36 PM
Notice of Presentment of Debtor's Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Related [+] filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. with presentment to be held on 8/5/2024 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL) (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Wed 07/17 2:30 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Bar Date Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Bar Date Notice
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
10 10 misc Matrix Tue 07/16 4:12 PM
Matrix / Amended Creditor Matrix and Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Official Forms 104/204 Tue 07/16 10:14 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , - Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules - Non-Individual , Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
8 8 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Mon 07/08 10:39 AM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 / Declaration of Daniel S. Dawkins Pursuant to S.D.N.Y. Local Bankruptcy Rules 1007-2 in Support of Chapter 11 Petition Filed by Julie Cvek Curley on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 22, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sun 06/23 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 06/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 order Case Management Order Re: Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case (BNC) Thu 06/20 1:30 PM
Case Management Order Signed On 6/20/2024, Regarding Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Scheduling Case Conference, and Setting Deadlines for Filing Plan; With Status Hearing to be held on 7/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Pre-Status Report Due By 7/11/2024. Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Thu 06/20 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 06/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Monday, June 17, 2024
4 4 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Mon 06/17 9:56 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/16/2024 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
misc Add Trustee Mon 06/17 9:54 AM
Trustee Samuel Dawidowicz added to the case. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 15, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Sat 06/15 2:28 PM
Letter /dial in information for the 341 meeting Filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs trustee Notice, Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Sat 06/15 2:24 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee.(Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Declaration of Subchapter V trustee
Friday, June 14, 2024
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 06/14 9:09 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 06/28/2024. Schedule A/B due 06/28/2024. Schedule D due 06/28/2024. Schedule E/F due 06/28/2024. Schedule G due 06/28/2024. Schedule H due 06/28/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 06/28/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/28/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 06/28/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 06/28/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 06/28/2024. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 06/28/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 06/28/2024, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/12/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference To Be Held Before 08/13/2024. Filed by Julie Cvek Curley of Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP on behalf of Dawkins Development Group Inc.. (Curley, Julie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 06/14 9:12 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-22537 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16668908. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Fri 06/14 9:19 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Harris, Kendra)
Related: [-]