Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Elaine E Bucklo
Case #: 1:24-cv-04939
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:31 AM CST
Defendant
The Entities and Individuals Identified in Schedule A
Defendant
11 November Store
Defendant
A3COK
Defendant
AEs Styling Beauty Store
Defendant
AMAMM
Defendant
Acolehuma Makeup Store
Defendant
BEST Supplies
Defendant
Be Beautyful Store
Defendant
BeaFota Store
Defendant
Beatuy Store
Defendant
Beautys Tools Store
Defendant
Bengbu WeCare Imp & Exp Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Bicopo
Defendant
BrownAugust Store
Defendant
CHENFANGUS
Defendant
ChRRng
Defendant
Cixi Lingshang E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Cloud Prime Hair Care Store
Defendant
Cloud Prime Skin Care Store
Defendant
Cloud Prime Store
Defendant
Coddess
Defendant
Crazy Women Cosmetics Store Store
Defendant
DLSLW
Defendant
Danping shop
Defendant
Deciniee Boutique Store
Defendant
Deciniee Official Store
Defendant
Dongguan Blue Queen Accessories Factory
Defendant
Dongguan Changyue Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
DrSugarm
Defendant
Eatop ae ae
Defendant
Emybow
Defendant
FLORRY
Defendant
Fashion Accessories Store
Defendant
Fashion Beauty Makeup Store
Defendant
Flora00 Store
Defendant
GENOVEGA
Defendant
GYHZ STORE
Defendant
Global Factory Selection Store
Defendant
Guangdong Zebra Jewelry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Lucky Girl Fashion Accessories Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Q&N Fashion Accessory Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Wangda Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Gusu District Tutan Trading Firm
Defendant
Hair Styling Tool Store
Defendant
Hangzhou New Emperor Imp& Exp Co., Ltd.
Defendant
HappyinHome Store
Defendant
Henan Letiao Beauty Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Henan Sikuni Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Heyang Industrial Co., Ltd
Defendant
Huiyun Health Beauty Store
Defendant
Huizhou Flower Cosmetics Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Huizhou Id Fashion Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Imoola US
Defendant
JJ Makeup Store
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #197
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #198
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #199
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #200
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #201
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #202
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #203
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #204
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #205
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #206
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #207
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #208
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #209
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #210
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #211
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #212
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #213
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #214
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #215
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #216
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #217
Defendant
Kunshan Zhongrixin International Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
LDQBM
Defendant
LEVAO Headwear Store
Defendant
Le Meadow Store
Defendant
Living Home aaaa
Defendant
Locura Amor
Defendant
Love MyHome Store
Defendant
Lovely Beauty Shop
Defendant
MS Beauty Store
Defendant
MUSTAFA KAYNAKCI
Defendant
May Factory Store
Defendant
Misautk
Defendant
New Beauty Dropshipping Store
Defendant
Nianye DIY Flagship store
Defendant
Ningbo Purly Imp.& Exp. Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Ningbo Spring Smiles Tada Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Normandy store
Defendant
Nunify Beautiful Store
Defendant
Professional Hair Salon Tools Store
Defendant
Putian Chengxiang District Ningtianmeng Department
Defendant
Putianshiyicaifutouziguanliyouxiangongsi
Defendant
RUNMINGg
Defendant
Recipe For Hair Store
Defendant
SAN QUAN STORE
Defendant
SEA-XING
Defendant
SIDINIC-US
Defendant
SUNSKY
Defendant
Shaanxi Rongwangyuantong International Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai Dazzle Accessories Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shaoxing City Dairui Textile Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Haokey Tech Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Hongchangshun Cosmetic Fittings Limited
Defendant
Shenzhen Kingyard Int'l Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Luzhengtong Keji Youxian Gongsi
Defendant
Shenzhen Mingbao Trading
Defendant
Shenzhen Onuliss Technology Co., Limited
Defendant
Shenzhen Xinhongyuan Bag Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Xunhu E-Commerce Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Shaoyi Che
Yz Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shop1100191056 Store
Defendant
Shop1102653109 Store
Defendant
Shop1102817039 Store
Defendant
Shop5370096 Store
Defendant
Soul Grocery
Defendant
Sunset Shop
Defendant
Suntiful Store
Defendant
TOPyoth
Defendant
Tangda
Defendant
The stars whisper
Defendant
VLIKU Dropshippings Store
Defendant
Vellosh
Defendant
WW department store
Defendant
Wigyy
Represented By
Hua Chen
Scienbizip, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
XunHu Store
Defendant
YEMRESTORE
Defendant
YUANXIAOBAO
Defendant
Yanyanmeimei Store
Defendant
Yiwu Blue Stone Imp&Exp Corporation
Defendant
Yiwu Good Morning Fashion Accessory Factory
Defendant
Yiwu Hongtai Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Huanhuan Garments Co., Ltd
Defendant
Yiwu Jiadai Jewelry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Jianyin E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Jiayu Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Qiyue Accessory Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Sangor Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Shenglan Ornaments Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Unai Promotion Gift Co., Ltd.
Defendant
ZDXQGRBHD
Defendant
ZT
Defendant
amybabe Store
Defendant
anqo
Defendant
b2c.us.b2c
Defendant
benleisd
Defendant
bonbons_closet
Defendant
byfw
Defendant
caipingsm
Defendant
chsb
Defendant
comac_4908
Defendant
deirqior
Defendant
dfhiuew
Defendant
double_deals99
Defendant
ewtrfdgdwesa
Defendant
fgyo
Defendant
flyingchannel
Defendant
fmpe
Defendant
h151
Defendant
hadidi
Defendant
haiqinrihua
Defendant
huihuiwang
Defendant
ilnbuhf
Defendant
jiehan_jewelry Store
Defendant
k9hz
Defendant
k9rs
Defendant
kaihuism
Defendant
kunmingbubeijingmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
lit25-10
Defendant
messick4
Defendant
n7e7
Defendant
newtoywholesale Store
Defendant
olos Store
Defendant
ovgq Store
Defendant
pamelmarr47
Defendant
pitean0
Defendant
plussign Official Store
Defendant
qianyixing
Defendant
qlhc
Defendant
r7sb
Defendant
rakus-23
Defendant
ranranshengqi
Defendant
rnii
Defendant
ruvina-online-store
Defendant
samluxii
Defendant
sexuality
Defendant
shba
Defendant
sledzik55r
Defendant
syfcnjie
Defendant
tangyaosd
Defendant
thamaramalanistore
Defendant
tuzanbhd
Defendant
u5n9 Store
Defendant
uamengs
Defendant
ub1h Store
Defendant
umxt
Defendant
uvds
Defendant
v1to
Defendant
vnrc
Defendant
weitianzhii
Defendant
worldtrade2022
Defendant
xamld
Defendant
ymc8
Defendant
yookiilye Store
Defendant
you yi tian
Defendant
zbgz
Defendant
zbzt Store
Defendant
zhensimeikejiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
zuxj
Defendant
zykz
Plaintiff
Emikeni Inc
Represented By
Kelley Stebbins Gordon
Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP
contact info
John Joseph Lucas
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP
contact info
Gregory James Chinlund
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun
contact info
Benjamin T Horton
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP
contact info
Krista M. Solano
Marshall Gerstein & Borun
contact info
Valerie Rose Cambronne
Marshall Gerstein & Borun
contact info
Michelle Bolos
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Entities and Individuals Identified in Schedule A
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CQH Shop
Terminated: 11/25/2024
Represented By
David Silver
Bayramoglu Law Offices LLC
contact info
Defendant
Makandup
Terminated: 11/20/2024


Docket last updated: 08/14/2024 2:27 AM CDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (jb, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22142769.(Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Schedule A (coversheet)
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. Sealed Schedule A (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by Michelle Bolos (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by Benjamin T Horton (Horton, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by Gregory James Chinlund (Chinlund, Gregory)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by Kelley Stebbins Gordon (Gordon, Kelley)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by John Joseph Lucas (Lucas, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by Valerie Rose Cambronne (Cambronne, Valerie)
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. by Krista M. Solano (Solano, Krista)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc.Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal(Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
14 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. Electronic Service of Process Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3) (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
15 15 RESPONSE by Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc.in Support of MOTION by Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. Electronic Service of Process Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3) 14 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Electronic Service of Process (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
17 17 14 pgs MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
18 18 DECLARATION of Michelle Bolos Declaration of Michelle Bolos in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery and Electronic Service of Process(Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
19 19 DECLARATION of Emily Karal Kenison Declaration of Emily Karal Kenison in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery(Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
20 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emikeni Inc., f/k/a Straplets Inc. Exhibit 4 to Kenison Declaration(Bolos, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh. 4 - 2 of 9,
Att: 2 Exh. 4 - 3 of 9,
Att: 3 Exh. 4 - 4 of 9,
Att: 4 Exh. 4 - 5 of 9,
Att: 5 Exh. 4 - 6 of 9,
Att: 6 Exh. 4 - 7 of 9,
Att: 7 Exh. 4 - 8 of 9,
Att: 8 Exh. 4 - 9 of 9